Dodson v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Kevin Michael Dodson and Kevin M. Dodson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv01272
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kevin M. Dodson. Commissioner of SSA served on 8/30/18. (KXS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kevin M. Dodson. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/4/18 by serving the U.S Attorney General. (EAB)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kevin M. Dodson. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/27/2018; Answer due 10/26/2018. (EAB)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were delivered via interoffice mail to United States Marshal for service. (CBL)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (See Full Order.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/1/2018. (CBL)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/1/2018. (CBL)
August 1, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin Michael Dodson. (Eaglin, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Kevin Michael Dodson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Eaglin, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Michael Dodson
Represented By: Paul Bradford Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M. Dodson
Represented By: Paul Bradford Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?