United States of America v. Springfield Armory Inc., .45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Springfield Armory Inc., .45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730 and One Hundred and Thirty-One Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition
Case Number: 4:2018cv01320
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Levell Littleton, Type of return 8/16/20148, Mailed Certified, Cert No: 9414816902246689801851, (CLO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Rachel Carter, 8/16/2018 Mailed Certified, Cert No 941486902246689801820 (CLO)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed party served - One Hundred & Thirtv-One Rounds of.45 Caliber Ammunition, Type of return Complaint & Warrant, ASSET IN CUSTODY OF ATF - BUREAU of ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES08/16/2018 - Served and 08/23/2018 accepted by Nicole D. Hover with ATF via Electronic Means(KKS)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Springfield Armory Inc..45 Cal. Pistol, Serial No. GM 475730, Type of return Complaint & Warrant, ASSET IN CUSTODY OF ATF - BUREAU of ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES 08/16/2018 - Served and 08/23/2018 accepted by Nicole D. Hover with ATF via Electronic Means (KKS)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For Springfield Armory Pistol, #4 Warrant For Assorted Ammunition)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
August 13, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantSpringfield Armory Inc.,.45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730. (MFG)
August 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MFG)
August 13, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantOne Hundred and Thirty-One Rounds of.45 Caliber Ammunition. (MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Springfield Armory Inc., .45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Armory Inc., .45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred and Thirty-One Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay L. McClure-Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?