Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 3.31 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, et al
Plaintiff: SPIRE STL PIPELINE LLC
Defendant: 2.38 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Portage Des Sioux, City of, GULF CENTRAL PIPELINE COMPANY, MICHAEL STANLEY MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003, MICHAEL STANLEY MINTERT and CARLA SUE MINTERT as TRUSTEES OF THE MICHAEL STANLEY MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003, 3.31 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, COLLECTOR OF REVENUE OF ST. CHARLES COUNTY, 2.53 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 7.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Carla Sue Mintert, OTHER UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS OR OTHER LEGAL ENTITIES WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST, Michael Stanley Mintert and CARLA SUE MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003
Consolidated Defendant: 3.04 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Capital Commerce Mortgage Co., 0.44 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.48 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Pamela S. Beckham, Williams Communications, Inc., Doris L. Mazzola, 2.59 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Derrill F. Machens, Eugene E. Beckham, Wilbur Beckemeier GST Family Trust Dated February 20, 2003, 2.24 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Prairie Pipe Line Company, 0.84 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.37 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 2.54 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Little Farm, LLC, Janet L. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, 4.70 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Shirley Hoelscher, Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Alice Mae Rothermich, 3.22 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.47 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 3.29 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Michelle A. Beckham, Alax Pipe Line Company, Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, State of Missouri, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Carrollton Bank, Gerald A. Rothermich, 1.95 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.61 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.73 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Clarice R. Beckemeier, 2.64 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.38 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Derrill F Machens, Nancy Machens, Elsa M. Borgschulte, Trustee of the Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Sinclair Pipe Line Company, Stanolind Pipe Line Co., Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Kevin Machens, 2.20 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, St. Louis Water Company, 1.68 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Mississippi River Transmission Corporation, Carol A. Saale, 2.49 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, The School Sisters of Notre Dame of St. Louis, Kathleen C. Thomas, Eugene E. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Sherry A. Hunt, Virginia A. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995, 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, St. Louis Pipeline Corporation, Donna Kaufrmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Shelley Machens, Emily L Schmidt, 2.39 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.11 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 0.52 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Ajax Pipe Line Corporation, Collector of Revenue of St. Louis County, 1.99 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Aloysius A. Machens as Trustee of the Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987, Cletus A. Kampmann, 1.67 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, J Michael Pavlovits, M & E Farms, Inc., 2.58 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.37 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.56 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, David L. Machens, Saale Family LP, 2.10 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Bradley D Schmidt, Eugene Weidner, 0.67 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Joyce Weidner, 1.21 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 2.03 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, First Community Credit Union, Mary E. Mintert, Prairie Oil and Gas Co., 0.77 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Eugene Weidner and Joyce Weidner Revocable Trust, dated October 26, 1999, 5.72 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Sharon Poggenmoeller, 0.85 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Geraldine E. Pavlovits, Dennis H. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995, 1.09 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.78 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 4.13 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Dennis H. Schaeffer, 0.99 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.43 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.26 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 0.92 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.06 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Vincent J. Saale, Verona M. Kampmann, 0.73 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Virginia A. Schaeffer, Werner Properties, LLC, 0.69 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Saale Farms, Inc., 0.41 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.55 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Alan Poggemoeller, 0.46 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.58 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.31 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 2.63 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Explorer Pipeline Company, 0.36 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.22 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Janet L. Beckham, Clarice R. Beckemeier Revocable Living Trust Agreement Trust Dated February 20, 2003, Nustar Pipeline Operating Partnership L.P., F & Z Knobbe Farm, LLC, The Verona M. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004, Social Betterment Properties International, 1.20 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Donna Kaufmann, 2.07 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.25 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 0.01 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, 0.42 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.13 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.06 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Sandra E. Austin, 0.54 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.53 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, McCann Farms LLC, 3.89 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.49 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.29 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Karla J. Machens, 1.18 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, City of West Alton, 1.12 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.55 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Shirley A. Milliken, The Gerald A. Rothermich and Alice Mae Rothermich Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated November 18, 1993, Platte Pipe Line Company, 1.36 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Richard S. Hunt, 1.24 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Carol J. Connoyer, Casper Brass Farm LLC, Machens Family LLC, 0.71 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, C & J Steinhoff Properties, LLC, 0.59 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 5.05 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.55 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, The Margaret G. Bell Revocable Living Trust, Dated July 11, 2002, Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District, Central Bank of St. Louis, 0.47 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Margaret G. Bell, CITY OF PORTAGE DES SIOUX, 0.26 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Simon Farms, L.L.C., Bank of America, N.A., 2.26 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, The Cletus A. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004, Shell Pipe Line Corporation, William W. Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Union Electric Company, 0.16 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 2.21 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Eugene Weidner, as Trustee of Eugene Weidner and Joyce Weidner Revocable Trust, dated October 26, 1999, 3.76 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Metropolitan Park and Recreation District, 0.34 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 0.29 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.85 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, 0.38 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.13 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Sinclair Refining Company, 1.80 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Neal Rothermich, Wood River Pipeline Company, 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Barbara A. Schlemmer, 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.82 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, LP, Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987, 0.23 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.34 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Richard Norbert Rufkahr, William W. Kaufmann, 2.27 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.20 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Elaine June Rufkahr, 1.61 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.43 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Richard Hoelscher, St. Louis County Missouri American Water Company, Elsa M. Borgschulte, Trustee of the Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Alan A. Schlemmer, 1.81 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.86 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.45 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.16 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Trust for Public Land, a Non-Profit California Corporation and 0.51 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Case Number: 4:2018cv01327
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 77 ENTRY of Appearance by Maikieta Antoinette Brantley for Consolidated Filer Defendant Werner Properties, LLC. (Brantley, Maikieta)
October 12, 2018 Filing 76 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R. Kalb for Consolidated Filer Defendant Shirley Hoelscher. (Kalb, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 75 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R. Kalb for Consolidated Filer Defendant Richard Hoelscher. (Kalb, Brian)
October 10, 2018 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on State of Missouri, Eric Schmitt, Treasurer, c/o Jonathan Hensley, General Counsel by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 10, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Consolidated Filer Defendant Collector of Revenue of St. Louis County to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/16/2018. (JAB)
October 6, 2018 Filing 73 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Powers Kellett for Consolidated Filer Defendants Margaret G. Bell, Eugene Weidner and Joyce Weidner Revocable Trust, dated October 26, 1999, Eugene Weidner, as Trustee of Eugene Weidner and Joyce Weidner Revocable Trust, dated October 26, 1999, Cletus A. Kampmann, Verona M. Kampmann, Alan A. Schlemmer, Barbara A. Schlemmer, The Cletus A. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004, The Margaret G. Bell Revocable Living Trust, Dated July 11, 2002, The Verona M. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004, Eugene Weidner, Joyce Weidner. (Kellett, Christopher)
October 5, 2018 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on First Community Credit Union by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Geraldine Pavlovits by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on J Michael Pavlovits by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on St. Louis Pipeline Corporation by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on St. Louis Water Company, Curtis Skouby, P.E., Water Commissioner by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Trust for Public Land, A Non-Profit California Corporation by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Metropolitan Park & Recreation District d/b/a Great Rivers Greenway, Attn: Michael Carson by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Shirley Hoelscher by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Richard Hoelscher by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on AT&T Attn: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on The School Sisters of Notre Dame of St. Louis by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Social Betterment Properties International, c/o Jerry Ferguson by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Union Electric Company by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Barbara A. Schlemmer by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Alan A. Schlemmer by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Eugene Weidner by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Joyce Weidner by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Collector of Revenue, County of St. Louis, Missouri by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Sherry A. Hunt by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Richard S. Hunt by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on Daddu, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on Collector of Revenue, St. Louis, County, Missouri by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on CorGaf, LLC by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Amended Service of Documents on Mississippi River Transmission Corporation by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Amended Service of Documents on St. Louis County Missouri American Water Company by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on Capitol Commerce Mortgage Co. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on City of West Alton by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on M&E Farms, Inc. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Amended Service of Documents on Wood River Pipeline Company, c/o Koch Pipeline Company, L.P. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Amended Service of Documents on Shell Pipe Line Corporation by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on State of Missouri, Eric Schmitt, Treasurer, c/o Jonathan Hensley, General Counsel, by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on Simon Farms, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 5, 2018 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Amended Service of Documents on Gulf Central Pipeline Company, c/o Koch Pipeline Company, L.P. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
October 2, 2018 Filing 38 ENTRY of Appearance by Kim R. Reid for Consolidated Filer Defendant State of Missouri. (Reid, Kim)
October 2, 2018 Filing 37 (NOTICE RE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICATION DELETED DUE TO ATTORNEY FILING ERROR)NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Defendant CITY OF PORTAGE DES SIOUX (Wallach, Jerome) Remark: Notice re Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction was received from consolidated filer defendant City of Portage Des Sioux on 9/26/18 (JAB).
October 2, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing parties to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction within 5 days. Click #here for the instructions. Parties that have already submitted the Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction may disregard this notice. (JAB)
October 1, 2018 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Luke G. Maher for Consolidated Filer Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Maher, Luke)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF PUBLICATION NOTICE: IT IS ORDERED that a copy hereof be published according to law in the St. Charles Business Record, a newspaper of general circulation published in St. Charles County, Missouri, and in The Countian, a newspaper of general circulation published in St. Louis County, Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/28/18. (JAB)
September 27, 2018 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy P. Duggan for Consolidated Filer Defendant State of Missouri. (Duggan, Timothy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerome Wallach for Consolidated Filer Defendant CITY OF PORTAGE DES SIOUX. (Wallach, Jerome)
September 26, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Inability to Serve, #2 Text of Proposed Order - IT IS ORDERED that a copy hereof be published according to law in the St. Charles Business Record, a newspaper of general circulation published in St. Charles County, Missouri, and in The Countian, a newspaper of general circulation published in St. Louis County, Missouri.)(Sonderegger, Paul)
September 24, 2018 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant McCann Farms LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01382-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Saale Farms, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01361-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Saale Family LP. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01356-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Simon Farms, L.L.C.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Yes,. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01351-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Consolidated Filer Defendant M & E Farms, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01359-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker for Consolidated Filer Defendants Richard S. Hunt, Sherry A. Hunt. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01519-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Wunderlich for Consolidated Filer Defendant Werner Properties, LLC. (Wunderlich, Richard)
September 19, 2018 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant 3.31 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Consolidated Filer Defendant Machens Family LLC. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Guinness, Robert)
September 19, 2018 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Guinness for Defendant 3.31 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Consolidated Filer Defendant Machens Family LLC. (Guinness, Robert)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #20 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm Robert Guinness for Jordan Walker by Consolidated Filer Defendant Machens Family LLC. Attorney Robert J. Guinness for Machens Family LLC added. Attorney Jordan H. Walker terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/18/18. (KKS)
September 17, 2018 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert E. Fox, Jr for Consolidated Filer Defendant Collector of Revenue of St. Louis County. (Fox, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Jordan Walker ;substituted for:Robert Guinness by Consolidated Filer Defendant Machens Family LLC. (Walker, Jordan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler Charles Schaeffer for Consolidated Filer Defendants Dennis H. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995, Dennis H. Schaeffer, Dennis H. Schaeffer, Virginia A. Schaeffer, Virginia A. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995. (Schaeffer, Tyler)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Powers Kellett for Consolidated Filer Defendants Dennis H. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995, Dennis H. Schaeffer, Dennis H. Schaeffer, Virginia A. Schaeffer, Virginia A. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995. (Kellett, Christopher)
September 12, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Consolidated Filer Defendants Clarice R. Beckemeier Revocable Living Trust Agreement Trust Dated February 20, 2003, Carol J. Connoyer, Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Donna Kaufrmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Elsa M. Borgschulte, Trustee of the Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Elsa M. Borgschulte, Trustee of the Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Eugene E. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, F & Z Knobbe Farm, LLC, Janet L. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Donna Kaufmann, Donna Kaufmann, William W. Kaufmann, Little Farm, LLC, M & E Farms, Inc., David L. Machens, Derrill F. Machens, Derrill F Machens, Karla J. Machens, Kevin Machens, Nancy Machens, Shelley Machens, Machens Family LLC, Doris L. Mazzola, McCann Farms LLC, Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Shirley A. Milliken, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Mary E. Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Alan Poggemoeller, Sharon Poggenmoeller, Alice Mae Rothermich, Gerald A. Rothermich, Neal Rothermich, Elaine June Rufkahr, Elaine June Rufkahr, Richard Norbert Rufkahr, Carol A. Saale, Vincent J. Saale, Saale Family LP, Saale Farms, Inc., Bradley D Schmidt, Emily L Schmidt, Simon Farms, L.L.C., The Gerald A. Rothermich and Alice Mae Rothermich Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated November 18, 1993, Kathleen C. Thomas, Wilbur Beckemeier GST Family Trust Dated February 20, 2003, William W. Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987, Aloysius A. Machens as Trustee of the Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987, Sandra E. Austin, Clarice R. Beckemeier, Clarice R. Beckemeier, Eugene E. Beckham, Janet L. Beckham, Michelle A. Beckham, Pamela S. Beckham, C & J Steinhoff Properties, LLC, CARLA SUE MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003, Casper Brass Farm LLC, Defendants Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003 to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/1/2018. (JAB)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Documents on Nextiraone LLC, Attn Williams Communications, Inc. by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN, 4:18-cv-01359-DDN, 4:18-cv-01370-DDN, 4:18-cv-01371-DDN, 4:18-cv-01372-DDN(Meanes, Pamela)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the subject motions (Docs. #13 and #15 ) are GRANTED, in that: All defendants in this consolidated case, whether or not represented by movants' counsel, must respond to plaintiffs complaint no later than October 29, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status-organizational conference of the Court with all parties (or counsel only, if represented by counsel) in this consolidated case is set for on Thursday, October 18, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. ( Response to Court due by 10/29/2018., Status Conference set for 10/18/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 17N before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/12/18. (KKS)
September 11, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Mary E. Mintert, David L. Machens, Nancy Machens, Alice Mae Rothermich, Gerald A. Rothermich, Neal Rothermich, The Gerald A. Rothermich and Alice Mae Rothermich Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated November 18, 1993, Saale Family LP, McCann Farms LLC, Saale Farms, Inc., Saale Farms, Inc., Carla Sue Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Clarice R. Beckemeier, Clarice R. Beckemeier, Clarice R. Beckemeier Revocable Living Trust Agreement Trust Dated February 20, 2003, Wilbur Beckemeier GST Family Trust Dated February 20, 2003, Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Donna Kaufmann, Donna Kaufmann, William W. Kaufmann, Derrill F. Machens, Derrill F Machens, Karla J. Machens, Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Elaine June Rufkahr, Elaine June Rufkahr, Richard Norbert Rufkahr, William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Carla Sue Mintert Trust Dated January 10, 2003, Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Carol A. Saale, Vincent J. Saale, Carla Sue Mintert Trust Dated January 10, 2003, Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Saale Farms, Inc., Alan Poggemoeller, Sharon Poggenmoeller, Kathleen C. Thomas, Casper Brass Farm LLC, M & E Farms, Inc., Little Farm, LLC, Sandra E. Austin, Eugene E. Beckham, Janet L. Beckham, Michelle A. Beckham, Pamela S. Beckham, Carol J. Connoyer, Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Eugene E. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Janet L. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust, Doris L. Mazzola, Shirley A. Milliken, Mary E. Mintert, Simon Farms, L.L.C., C & J Steinhoff Properties, LLC, Machens Family LLC, Saale Family LP, F & Z Knobbe Farm, LLC, Elsa M. Borgschulte, Elsa M. Borgschulte, Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998, Kevin Machens, Shelley Machens, Bradley D Schmidt, Emily L Schmidt, Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987, Aloysius A. Machens. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-DDN et al.(Walker, Jordan)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion for consolidation (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED, in that the Clerk is ORDERED to reassign the following cases to the undersigned and consolidate them with the instant case for all purposes:(see order for case numbers.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order of Consolidation be filed in each of the above cases, as well as the instant case, and that all future documents be filed in the instant case, 4: 18 CV 1327 DDN. Each of the above cases shall be administratively closed and no further filings will be accepted in those closed cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motions to extend filed in the above cases be denied as moot before consolidation and closure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, once all cases have been reassigned to Magistrate judge David D. Noce in 4:18 CV 1327 DDN, the Clerk of Court will issue a Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form to any parties who have not yet received one. Those parties who have not yet had the opportunity to file their option for a United States District Judge or for consent to the authority of a United States Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636 must submit their completed consent forms (available online) within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the reassignment of the consolidated cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/10/18. (KXS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Carla Sue Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert. (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker for Defendants Michael Stanley Mintert Trust dated January 10, 2003, Carla Sue Mintert, Carla Sue Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert, Michael Stanley Mintert. (Walker, Jordan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on the Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Gulf Central Pipeline Company by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on the City of Portage des Sioux by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Carla and Michael Mintert by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC.. (Meanes, Pamela)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul T. Sonderegger for Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Sonderegger, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Elise Nicole Puma for Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Puma, Elise)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 16, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (JWD)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6698624, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by SPIRE STL PIPELINE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FERC Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plat Map, #4 Attachment Notice of Condemnation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Meanes, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 3.31 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.38 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portage Des Sioux, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULF CENTRAL PIPELINE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL STANLEY MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL STANLEY MINTERT and CARLA SUE MINTERT as TRUSTEES OF THE MICHAEL STANLEY MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.31 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Represented By: Robert J. Guinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLECTOR OF REVENUE OF ST. CHARLES COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.53 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Sue Mintert
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTHER UNKNOWN INDIVIDUALS OR OTHER LEGAL ENTITIES WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stanley Mintert
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLA SUE MINTERT TRUST DATED JANUARY 10, 2003
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPIRE STL PIPELINE LLC
Represented By: Pamela J. Meanes
Represented By: Paul T. Sonderegger
Represented By: Elise Nicole Puma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 3.04 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Capital Commerce Mortgage Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.44 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.48 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Pamela S. Beckham
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Williams Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Doris L. Mazzola
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.59 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Derrill F. Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Eugene E. Beckham
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wilbur Beckemeier GST Family Trust Dated February 20, 2003
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.24 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Prairie Pipe Line Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.84 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.37 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.54 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Little Farm, LLC
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Janet L. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 4.70 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Shirley Hoelscher
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alice Mae Rothermich
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 3.22 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.47 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 3.29 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Michelle A. Beckham
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alax Pipe Line Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: State of Missouri
Represented By: Timothy P. Duggan
Represented By: Kim R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Luke G. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Carrollton Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Gerald A. Rothermich
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.95 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.61 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.73 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Clarice R. Beckemeier
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.64 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.38 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Derrill F Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nancy Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Elsa M. Borgschulte, Trustee of the Dorwood F. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sinclair Pipe Line Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Stanolind Pipe Line Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kevin Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.20 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: St. Louis Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.68 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mississippi River Transmission Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Carol A. Saale
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.49 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The School Sisters of Notre Dame of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kathleen C. Thomas
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Eugene E. Beckham as Trustee of the Eugene E. Beckham & Janet L. Beckham Revocable Trust
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sherry A. Hunt
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Virginia A. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: St. Louis Pipeline Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Donna Kaufrmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Shelley Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Emily L Schmidt
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.39 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.11 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.52 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ajax Pipe Line Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Collector of Revenue of St. Louis County
Represented By: Robert E. Fox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.99 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aloysius A. Machens as Trustee of the Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cletus A. Kampmann
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.67 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J Michael Pavlovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: M & E Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.58 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.37 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.56 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: David L. Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Saale Family LP
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.10 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bradley D Schmidt
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Eugene Weidner
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.67 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Joyce Weidner
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.21 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.03 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: First Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mary E. Mintert
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Prairie Oil and Gas Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.77 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Eugene Weidner and Joyce Weidner Revocable Trust, dated October 26, 1999
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 5.72 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sharon Poggenmoeller
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.85 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Geraldine E. Pavlovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dennis H. Schaeffer Trust Dated March 2, 1995
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.09 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.78 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 4.13 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dennis H. Schaeffer
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.99 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.43 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.26 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.92 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.06 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vincent J. Saale
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verona M. Kampmann
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.73 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Virginia A. Schaeffer
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Werner Properties, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Wunderlich
Represented By: Maikieta Antoinette Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.69 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Saale Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.41 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.55 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alan Poggemoeller
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.46 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.58 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.31 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.63 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Explorer Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.36 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.22 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Janet L. Beckham
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Clarice R. Beckemeier Revocable Living Trust Agreement Trust Dated February 20, 2003
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nustar Pipeline Operating Partnership L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: F & Z Knobbe Farm, LLC
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Verona M. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Social Betterment Properties International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.20 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Donna Kaufmann
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.07 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.25 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.01 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trush Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.42 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.13 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.06 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sandra E. Austin
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.54 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.53 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: McCann Farms LLC
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 3.89 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.49 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.29 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Karla J. Machens
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.18 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: City of West Alton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.12 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.55 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Shirley A. Milliken
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Gerald A. Rothermich and Alice Mae Rothermich Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated November 18, 1993
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Platte Pipe Line Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.36 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Richard S. Hunt
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.24 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Carol J. Connoyer
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Casper Brass Farm LLC
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Machens Family LLC
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Represented By: Robert J. Guinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.71 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: C & J Steinhoff Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.59 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 5.05 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.55 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Margaret G. Bell Revocable Living Trust, Dated July 11, 2002
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Central Bank of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.47 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Margaret G. Bell
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CITY OF PORTAGE DES SIOUX
Represented By: Jerome Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.26 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Simon Farms, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.26 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Cletus A. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Shell Pipe Line Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: William W. Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Union Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.16 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.21 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Eugene Weidner, as Trustee of Eugene Weidner and Joyce Weidner Revocable Trust, dated October 26, 1999
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 3.76 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Metropolitan Park and Recreation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.34 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.29 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.85 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.38 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.13 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sinclair Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.80 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Neal Rothermich
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wood River Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Barbara A. Schlemmer
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.82 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aloysius A. Machens Trust Dated December 1, 1987
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.23 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.34 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Richard Norbert Rufkahr
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: William W. Kaufmann
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 2.27 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.20 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Elaine June Rufkahr
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.61 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.43 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Richard Hoelscher
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: St. Louis County Missouri American Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Elsa M. Borgschulte, Trustee of the Elsa M. Borgschulte Revocable Trust U/T/A Dated May 28, 1998
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alan A. Schlemmer
Represented By: Christopher Powers Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.81 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.86 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.45 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 1.16 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trust for Public Land, a Non-Profit California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: 0.51 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?