Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.91 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri et al

Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: The Verona M. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004, Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County, 0.91 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, The Cletus A. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004, 0.72 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Cletus A. Kampmann, Verona M. Kampmann, Union Electric Company, Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest and Portage Des Sioux, City of
Case Number: 4:2018cv01373
Filed: August 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
0 Judge: Jean C Hamilton
1 Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion for consolidation (Doc. 3) is GRANTED, in that the Clerk is ORDERED to reassign the following cases to the undersigned and consolidate them with the instant case for all purposes: (see order for case numbers.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order of Consolidation be filed in each of the above cases, as well as the instant case, and that all future documents be filed in the instant case, 4: 18 CV 1327 DDN. Each of the above cases shall be administratively closed and no further filings will be accepted in those closed cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motions to extend filed in the above cases be denied as moot before consolidation and closure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, once all cases have been reassigned to Magistrate judge David D. Noce in 4:18 CV 1327 DDN, the Clerk of Court will issue a Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form to any parties who have not yet received one. Those parties who have not yet had the opportunity to file their option for a United States District Judge or for consent to the authority of a United States Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636 must submit their completed consent forms (available online) within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the reassignment of the consolidated cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/10/18. (KXS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on Union Electric Company by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on the St. Charles County Collector of Revenue by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice of Condemnation on the City of Portage des Sioux by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Meanes, Pamela)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC.. (Meanes, Pamela)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC with case number 4:18-cv-01327 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Attachment 2 - Memorandum In Support of Motion to Consolidate)(Meanes, Pamela)
August 20, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
August 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Eminent Domain against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6704011, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FERC Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plat Map, #4 Attachment - Notice of Condemnation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Meanes, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.91 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Verona M. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.91 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cletus A. Kampmann Revocable Trust Dated April 22, 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.72 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cletus A. Kampmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verona M. Kampmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portage Des Sioux, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Pamela J. Meanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?