Carman v. Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joey Carman
Defendant: Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01429
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. (Bodney, David) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/17/18. (KEK)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Bodney. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6787496) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/2/2018. (NEP)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Bodney. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6787496) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/17/18. (ARL)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Byrne Sullivan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6752591) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/14/18. (ARL)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Sullivan, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Byrne Sullivan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6752591) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas)
August 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz. (BAK)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joey Carman Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (BAK)
August 28, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Summons to issue when Notice of Process Server and Origianl Filing Form are filed. (BAK)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. with receipt number 0865-6718459, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Joey Carman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman v. Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.
Represented By: David J Bodney
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Carman
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?