United States of America v. $8,689.00 U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $8,689.00 U.S. Currency and Miscellaneous Firearms and Ammunition
Case Number: 4:2018cv01435
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed. Type of return Complaint & Notice. (BRP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Jermaine Wooten, Esq., Type of return Complaint and Notice. (KCB)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Casey, Stephen)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed as to $8,689.00 U.S. Currency. (AFC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed as to Miscellaneous Firearms & Ammunition. (AFC)
August 28, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
August 28, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendants $8,689.00 U.S. Currency, Miscellaneous Firearms and Ammunition. (BAK)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For $8,689.00, #4 Warrant For Firearms)(Casey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $8,689.00 U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,689.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Firearms and Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?