United States of America v. $69,897.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $69,897.00 U.S. Currency
Petitioner: Austin Asberry, Sharon Asberry, Stanley Asberry and Jacob Asberry
Case Number: 4:2018cv01462
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE to the Court Regarding Claimants' Motion to Dismiss: by Plaintiff United States of America (Casey, Stephen)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE Service of Special Interrogatories: by Plaintiff United States of America (Casey, Stephen)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Austin Asberry, Jacob Asberry, Sharon Asberry, Stanley Asberry.(KCB)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Movants Austin Asberry, Jacob Asberry, Sharon Asberry, Stanley Asberry. (KCB)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 VERIFIED CLAIM by Movants Austin Asberry, Jacob Asberry, Sharon Asberry, Stanley Asberry. (KCB)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MARSHAL Return Executed as to Austin Asberry. Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MARSHAL Return Executed as to Stanley Asberry. Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed as to Sharon Asberry. Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed as to Jacob Asberry. Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed as to Patrick E. Richmond, Esq. Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Casey, Stephen)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed: Type of return Complaint & Warrant. (AFC)
August 31, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
August 30, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant$69,897.00 U.S. Currency. (MFG)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $69,897.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Casey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $69,897.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $69,897.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Austin Asberry
Represented By: Patrick E. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sharon Asberry
Represented By: Patrick E. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Asberry
Represented By: Patrick E. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacob Asberry
Represented By: Patrick E. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?