United States of America v. 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Miscellaneous Jewelry and 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692
Claimant: Eli Abraham
Case Number: 4:2018cv01467
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw #11 MOTION to Stay and Joint Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff United States of America shall file its reply to Claimant's response no later than Monday, October 29, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/25/2018. (CLO)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Eli Abraham, Miscellaneous Jewelry.(Schonfeld, Richard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry, Claimant Eli Abraham. (Schonfeld, Richard)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Claimant Eli Abraham shall file his response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion, if any, no later than Friday, October 18, 2018. #11 . Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/16/18. (KKS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for November 20, 2018, at 10:00 AM by telephone. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/13/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/20/2018 10:00 AM in Telephone before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/15/2018. (CLO)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Return of Property Verified Claim and Demand for Return of Property by Defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry. (Schonfeld, Richard)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MARSHAL Return Executed party servedRita Aramyan, Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party servedEli Abraham, Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party served Kevin Boles, Type of return Complaint and Notices, (CLO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party servedRichard A. Schonfeld, Esq., Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed party servedMiscellaneous Jewelry, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, (CLO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed party served 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, (CLO)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Casey, Stephen)
August 31, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
August 31, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry. (BAK)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, #4 Warrant For Miscellaneous Jewelry)(Casey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Jewelry
Represented By: Richard Allan Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692
Represented By: Richard Allan Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eli Abraham
Represented By: Richard Allan Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?