Jefferson County et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Taney County, Washington County, Iron County, Greene County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Christian County, Jasper County, Stone County, Jefferson County and Cape Girardeau County
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Company, Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc, DepoMed Inc, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc., Missouri CVS LLC, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC., United Health Group Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Caremark LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Mylan N.V., Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. N/K/A Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Gurpreet S. Padda, M.D., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Insys, Cephalon, Inc., Center for Interventional Pain Management, d/b/a Comprehensive Pain Associates, LLC, WALGREENS COMPANY, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Optum, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Interventional Center for Pain Management, P.C., d/b/a Center for Interventional Paint Mangaement, Pharma, Inc., Operating as Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Padda Institute, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Noramco, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan PLC, Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C., Actavis LLC, Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Center for Interventional Pain Management
Case Number: 4:2018cv01477
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGSPENDING A DECISION BY THE JOINT PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/18/2018. (KCB)
October 15, 2018 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis Circuit Court, #66 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
October 15, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Stay [Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation] filed by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lawhorn, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Stay [Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation] filed by Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., and Express Scripts, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Their Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motions to Remand in Excess of the Page Limitation (ECF No. 76) is GRANTED. Their memorandum shall not exceed 25 pages exclusive of the signature page and attachments. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/12/18. (THL)
October 10, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lang, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for DepoMed, Inc., #2 Summons Summons for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., #3 Summons Summons for Johnson & Johnson)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2018 Filing 74 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc.. Parent companies: UnitedHealth Group Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: UnitedHealth Group Inc.,. (Warr, Jaclyn)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., Caremark Rx, L.L.C, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Walgreen Co., OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and United Healthcare of the Midwest, Inc.'s Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule (ECF No. 72) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any response memoranda in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (ECF No. 64), Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (ECF No. 66), Motion to Remand by Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan N.V. (ECF No. 69), and Defendants Gurpreet S. Padda, M.D., Center for Interventional Pain Management, Interventional Center for Pain Management, P.C., and Padda Institute's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 71) shall be filed no later than October 15, 2018. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that any reply memoranda to the same shall be filed no later than October 29, 2018. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/9/18. (THL)
October 4, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #71 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis Circuit Court, #64 MOTION to Stay [Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation], #66 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri [Certain Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule] by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Greiman, Gerald)
October 2, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Defendants Center for Interventional Pain Management, Gurpreet S. Padda, M.D., Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C., Padda Institute. (Watkins, Albert)
October 1, 2018 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis Circuit Court filed by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lawhorn, Christopher)
October 1, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis Circuit Court by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lawhorn, Christopher)
October 1, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Hearing re #66 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Lowe, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #66 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Lowe, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #64 MOTION to Stay [Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation] filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Conditional Transfer Order)(Greiman, Gerald)
October 1, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay [Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation] by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greiman, Gerald)
October 1, 2018 Filing 63 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Schwade for Defendants Center for Interventional Pain Management, Gurpreet S. Padda, M.D., Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C., Padda Institute. (Schwade, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 62 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert S. Watkins for Defendants Center for Interventional Pain Management, Gurpreet S. Padda, M.D., Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C., Padda Institute. (Watkins, Albert)
September 26, 2018 Filing 61 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walgreens Company.. (Galvin, John)
September 26, 2018 Filing 60 ENTRY of Appearance by Suzanne P. Galvin for Defendant Walgreens Company. (Galvin, Suzanne)
September 26, 2018 Filing 59 ENTRY of Appearance by Dana Walker Tucker for Defendant Walgreens Company. (Tucker, Dana)
September 26, 2018 Filing 58 ENTRY of Appearance by John E. Galvin, III for Defendant Walgreens Company. (Galvin, John)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Steven G. Kobre's and Matthew I. Menchel's Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF Nos. 55, 56) are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/26/18. (JEB)
September 24, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew I. Menchel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6774457) by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Menchel, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven G. Kobre. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6771389) by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kobre, Steven)
September 21, 2018 Filing 54 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc... (Meyer, Julie)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. for an Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition (ECF No. #52 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. may have 30 days after the later of: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand; or (2) the final decision of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether to transfer this case to the MDL Panel.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 09/21/2018. (KCB)
September 20, 2018 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Petition (Removal/Transfer), or to Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hanaway, Catherine)
September 20, 2018 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L. Hanaway for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hanaway, Catherine)
September 20, 2018 Filing 50 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hurtt, Robert)
September 20, 2018 Filing 49 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (CLO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Purdue Frederick Company. Parent companies: Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Shaw, Booker)
September 20, 2018 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Purdue Pharma L.P.. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Shaw, Booker)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition, by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, and #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. The defendants may have 30 days after the later of: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand; or (2) the final decision of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether to transfer this case to the MDL Panel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 09/19/2018. (ABK)
September 18, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,, by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie)
September 18, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Petition (Removal/Transfer), (Unopposed) by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, Booker)
September 18, 2018 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Felicia R. Williams for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company. (Williams, Felicia)
September 18, 2018 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by Heather Faye Counts for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company. (Counts, Heather)
September 18, 2018 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Booker T. Shaw for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company. (Shaw, Booker)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint, consent motion of defendants Mylan N.V. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for an extension of time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' petition (Doc 34) is sustained in part. Like the other defendants in this matter, the Mylan defendants may have 30 days after the later of: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand; or (2) the final decision of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether or not to transfer this case to the MDL Panel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/18/2018. (CLO) (Main Document 40 replaced on 9/20/2018) (CLO). Modified on 9/20/2018 (ABK).
September 17, 2018 Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by Meghan M. Lamping for Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lamping, Meghan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #34 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Filing Memo attaching Proposed Order for Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading (Lawhorn, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay Leible Combs for Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Combs, Lindsay)
September 17, 2018 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mylan N.V... (Lawhorn, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Lawhorn, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lawhorn, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher J. Lawhorn for Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lawhorn, Christopher)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adriana Riviere-Badell by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. ; GRANTING #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julian W. Park by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/13/18. (KKS)
September 12, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julian W. Park. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6750008) by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Park, Julian)
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adriana Riviere-Badell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6749886) by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
September 10, 2018 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Company. Parent companies: None,. (Bennett, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Parent companies: Amerisource Bergen Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Publicly held company: AmerisourceBergen Corporation,. (Bennett, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant United Health Group Incorporated. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Herren, Mitchell)
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant OptumRx, Inc.. Parent companies: OptumRx Holdings, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Herren, Mitchell)
September 10, 2018 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Optum, Inc.. Parent companies: UnitedHealthcare Services, Inc., Publicly held company: None,. (Herren, Mitchell)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint, consent motion of certain defendants for an extension of time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' petition (Doc 17) is sustained. Defendants may have 30 days after the later of: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand; or (2) the final decision of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether or not to transfer this case to the MDL Panel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/10/18. (KKS) (Main Document 24 replaced on 9/20/2018) (CLO). Modified on 9/20/2018 (ABK).
September 10, 2018 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant McKesson Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Schaecher, Corey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL re #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Consent Motion by Certain Defendants for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition] ;Extension to file the following: Move, Answer or Response ;Proposed [Filing Memo and Proposed Order] by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greiman, Gerald)
September 7, 2018 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Arsenio L. Mims for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Company, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Mims, Arsenio)
September 7, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Company, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Bennett, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Corey Michael Schaecher for Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Schaecher, Corey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Rothschild for Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Rothschild, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Consent Motion by Certain Defendants for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition] ;Extension to file the following: Move, Answer or Response ;Proposed extension date 30 days from date of Court Order by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Greiman, Gerald)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerald P. Greiman for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremarkpcs Health LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Greiman, Gerald)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Alyson Marie Petrick for Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Petrick, Alyson)
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Jaclyn Niccole Warr for Defendant United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc.. (Warr, Jaclyn)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by John Francis Garvey, Jr for Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Garvey, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley Joseph Schlozman for Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated. (Schlozman, Bradley)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell Lee Herren for Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated. (Herren, Mitchell)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah Shoemake Doles for Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Greene County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Stone County, Taney County, Washington County. (Doles, Sarah) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/7/2018) (CLO).
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 4, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Iron County, Cape Girardeau County, Jefferson County, Taney County, Washington County, Greene County, Christian County, Stone County, Jasper County, City of Joplin, Crawford County.(BAK)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Notice of Removal)(Lang, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Lang, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc.. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: Yes, Publicly held company: No,. (Lang, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: Yes, Publicly held company: No,. (Lang, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts Holding Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. (Lang, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang for Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lang, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, case number 1822-CC10883, with receipt number 0865-6728851, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings Part 1 Combined, #3 Exhibit State Court Filings Part 2 Combined, #4 Exhibit Excecuted Orders Granting Extension of Time, #5 Civil Cover Sheet , #6 Original Filing Form )(Lang, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson County et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Corey Michael Schaecher
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Company
Represented By: Arsenio L. Mims
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Booker T. Shaw
Represented By: Heather Faye Counts
Represented By: Felicia R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DepoMed Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare of the Midwest, Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn Niccole Warr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri CVS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lawhorn
Represented By: Meghan M. Lamping
Represented By: Lindsay Leible Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. N/K/A Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet S. Padda, M.D.
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Interventional Pain Management, d/b/a Comprehensive Pain Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS COMPANY
Represented By: Suzanne P. Galvin
Represented By: Dana Walker Tucker
Represented By: John E. Galvin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lawhorn
Represented By: Meghan M. Lamping
Represented By: Lindsay Leible Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interventional Center for Pain Management, P.C., d/b/a Center for Interventional Paint Mangaement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharma, Inc., Operating as Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padda Institute
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Arsenio L. Mims
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremarkpcs Health LLC
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Booker T. Shaw
Represented By: Heather Faye Counts
Represented By: Felicia R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interventional Center For Pain Management, P.C.
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Interventional Pain Management
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taney County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron County
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greene County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Joplin
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crawford County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Girardeau County
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?