United States of America v. $17,000.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $17,000.00 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Robert Garcia
Case Number: 4:2018cv01556
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert Garcia.(Herrick, Peter)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Claimant Robert Garcia Verified Claim Of Interest (Herrick, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return executed party servedPeter Herrick, Type of return complaint, (CLA)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter S Herrick. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6820912) by Claimant Robert Garcia. (Herrick, Peter) filed by Robert Garcia ; GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/18/2018. (AAS)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter S Herrick. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6820912) by Claimant Robert Garcia. (Herrick, Peter)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. $17,000.00 U.S. Currency served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (AAS)
September 17, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
September 17, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $17,000.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $17,000.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $17,000.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $17,000.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Garcia
Represented By: Peter Stanwood Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?