United States of America v. $36,432.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $36,432.00 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Jovan Ignjatovic
Case Number: 4:2018cv01582
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by $36,432.00 U.S. Currency.(Clanton, Russell)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER Re: #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Russell J Clanton by Defendant $36,432.00 U.S. Currency; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 24, 2018. (SAA)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 MARSHAL Return Executed. Type of return Complaint & Notice. (BRP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed. Type of return Complaint & Notice. (BRP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint Verified Claim of Interest by Defendant $36,432.00 U.S. Currency. (Clanton, Russell)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Russell J Clanton. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6831589) by Defendant $36,432.00 U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Clanton, Russell)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 MARSHAL Returned Executed filed by United States of America. $36,432.00 U.S. Currency served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (AAS)
September 19, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $36,432.00 U.S. Currency. (JWD)
September 19, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $36,432.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $36,432.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $36,432.00 U.S. Currency
Represented By: Russell J Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jovan Ignjatovic
Represented By: Russell J Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?