Norton v. Knapheide Equipment Co.
Plaintiff: Ryan Norton
Defendant: Knapheide Equipment Co.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01615
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 ORDER: Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/4/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/11/2018 10:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/18. (CSG)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Knapheide Equipment Co... (Morgan, Katrina)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant Knapheide Equipment Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Knapheide Equipment Co..(Morgan, Katrina)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY OF Appearance: by Plaintiff Ryan Norton (Silverstein, Jill) Modified on 10/29/2018 (CSG).
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Plaintiff Ryan Norton (Pierson, Joshua) Modified on 10/26/2018 (CSG).
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 CJRA ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge David D. Noce to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. for all further proceedings (KKS)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: as to Knapheide Equipment Co. Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Knapheide Equipment Co.. (Morgan, Katrina) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Knapheide Equipment Co. answer due 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/17/18. (JAB)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Knapheide Equipment Co.. (Morgan, Katrina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel S Kim for Defendant Knapheide Equipment Co.. (Kim, Rachel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Katrina Y. Morgan for Defendant Knapheide Equipment Co.. (Morgan, Katrina)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ryan Norton. Knapheide Equipment Co. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Wolf, Ferne)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John M. Hark for Plaintiff Ryan Norton. (Hark, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ryan Norton Process Server: WaterLand Litigation Services (BAK)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Appearance: by Plaintiff Ryan Norton (Wolf, Ferne)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Knapheide Equipment Co. with receipt number 0865-6774026, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Ryan Norton. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form , #2 Civil Cover Sheet , #3 Summons Knapheide Equipment Co. , #4 Form Notice of Intent to use Process Server)(Wolf, Ferne)
September 24, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Ferne P. Wolf. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Knapheide Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knapheide Equipment Co.
Represented By: Katrina Y. Morgan
Represented By: Rachel S Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Norton
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Represented By: John M. Hark
Represented By: Joshua Michael Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?