Russ v. Widewaters Hotels

Plaintiff: Cassandra Russ
Defendant: Widewaters Hotels
Case Number: 4:2018cv01638
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 12/13/2018. Discovery Completion due by 10/1/2019. ADR Future Reference 3/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2019. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/25/2018. (CLO)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED by agreement of the parties that the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for October 25, 2018 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/23/2018. (CLO)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Cassandra Russ. . (Barth, Brandy)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/18/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/25/2018 11:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/3/18. (KKS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Widewaters Hotels Sent To: State Court - Executed (Schwartz, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Widewaters Hotels. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Schwartz, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Widewaters Hotels.(Schwartz, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court Docket Sheet. (BAK)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Cassandra Russ.(BAK)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Widewaters Hotels . (Schwartz, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicole J. Lam for Defendant Widewaters Hotels . (Lam, Nicole)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Widewaters Hotels Sent To: Plaintiff (Lam, Nicole)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 18SL-CC03173, with receipt number 0865-6780665, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Widewaters Hotels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Lam, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russ v. Widewaters Hotels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Widewaters Hotels
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Represented By: Nicole J. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Russ
Represented By: Brandy B. Barth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?