Kennedy v. City of Saint Louis, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Kennedy
Defendant: City of St. Louis, William Olsten, John Hayden, City of Saint Louis, Missouri and John Does 1 and 2
Case Number: 4:2018cv01679
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kiara Nayo Drake for Plaintiff Calvin Kennedy. (Drake, Kiara)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Javad M. Khazaeli for Plaintiff Calvin Kennedy. (Khazaeli, Javad)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER of Service issued defendant All Defendants. sent to City of St. Louis and Police Department on October 3, 2018 filed by Calvin Kennedy. Waiver of Service due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Hayden, #2 Waiver of Service Olsten)(Wyrsch, James)
October 3, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Calvin Kennedy with receipt number 0865-6790961, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Calvin Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover, #7 Original Filing Form Original filing)(Wyrsch, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. City of Saint Louis, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Olsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Saint Louis, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 and 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Kennedy
Represented By: James R. Wyrsch
Represented By: Javad M. Khazaeli
Represented By: Kiara Nayo Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?