Atherton v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Billy Don Atherton, Jr.
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv01687
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, a request has been received for random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings. (CBL)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/11/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/18/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/30/2018. (CBL)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas J. Lamb for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Lamb, Nicholas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Dick, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by David A. Dick for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Dick, David)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Appearance of Daniel R. Francis: by Plaintiff Billy Don Atherton, Jr (Francis, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Billy Don Atherton, Jr. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Groves, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. The summons was emailed to attorney Steven L. Groves. (JWD)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Billy Don Atherton, Jr Process Server: McDowell & Associates (Groves, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JWD)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company with receipt number 0865-6792483, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Billy Don Atherton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Groves, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atherton v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: David A. Dick
Represented By: Nicholas J. Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Don Atherton, Jr.
Represented By: Steven L. Groves
Represented By: Daniel R. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?