Taylor v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Lana Taylor
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2018cv01700
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 8 SUPPLEMENTAL re #3 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Lana Taylor. (JAB)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for December 13, 2018, at 11:00 AM in the chambers of the undersigned. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/6/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/13/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/8/2018. (CLO)
November 7, 2018 6 ENTRY of Appearance by William E. Hanna for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William)
November 7, 2018 5 Defendant LINAs ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Boyer, Jamie)
November 7, 2018 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie L. Boyer for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Boyer, Jamie)
October 30, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Lana Taylor. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Arbogast, Deborah)
October 5, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Deborah A. Arbogast. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MFG)
October 4, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against defendant Life Insurance Company of North America with receipt number 0865-6797013, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Lana Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Arbogast, Deborah)
October 4, 2018 1 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Lana Taylor Process Server: Sheriff of Cole County (Arbogast, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jamie L. Boyer
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Taylor
Represented By: Deborah A. Arbogast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?