Mizell et al v. Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: David Mizell and Kyong Mizell
Defendant: Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01706
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #33 Third MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) filed by Kyong Mizell, David Mizell ; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/30/18. (KJS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 34 CONSENT to #33 Third MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC.. (Phoenix, G.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 33 Third MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: as to Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC Re: #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment filed by Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC ; FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN THE PREVIOUSLY ENTERED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SET ASIDE AND HELD FOR NAUGHT. DEFENDANT GRANTED 15 DAYS FORM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO ANSWER OR FILE OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING. (Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC answer due 12/14/2018.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/29/18. (KJS)
November 28, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment filed by Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Carman, Stephen)
November 28, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE Correction of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside the Default Judgment: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Duree, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment and Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Duree, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment filed by Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Phoenix, G.)
November 26, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment by Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Phoenix, G.)
November 21, 2018 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen William Carman for Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Carman, Stephen)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by G. Keith Phoenix for Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC. (Phoenix, G.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Release of Funds by Returning their $500.00 Cash TRO Bond by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for default judgment and for a permanent injunction (Doc. No. 20) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED That Defendant, Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC is hereby permanently enjoined from selling or otherwise disposing of Plaintiffs, David and Kyong Mizells, household goods and furnishings.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the amount of Plaintiffs money damages and attorneys fees shall be determined in subsequent proceedings. #20 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/19/18. (CLA)
November 15, 2018 Filing 22 Supplemental to #20 MOTION for Default Judgment on the Issue of Liability and for a Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Duree, David) Modified on 11/16/2018 (AAS).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kyong Mizell, David Mizell ;Granted. so ordered. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/9/18. (KJS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment on the Issue of Liability and for a Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE Serving the Order Continuing the Temporary Restarining Order on Defendant and Related Interested Parties: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell re #17 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Continue the Temporary Restraining Order an additional fourteen days up to and including November 12, 2018 is considered and for good cause, shown as enumerated in the record, is granted.The Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No.10) remains in effect untilNovember 12, 2018 at 10:50 A.M. The $500.00 cash bond will remain as the bond for the extension of the Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/23/18. (CLA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Extension of October 15, 2018 TRO of: TRO by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Duree, David) filed by Kyong Mizell, David Mizell ; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/23/18. (KJS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of October 15, 2018 TRO of: TRO by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Duree, David)
October 17, 2018 Receipt 4644075341 in the amount of $500.00 for COMM REG-OTHER-BOND-COLB on behalf of David and Kyong Mizell (CCAM)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Cash Bond for the Temporary Restraining Order has been Filed: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell re #10 Opinion Memorandum,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell re #10 Opinion Memorandum,, of Serving the Temporary Restraining Order on Defendant and Related Interested Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE Filing Return of Service of Summons on Defendant: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE Filing Return of Service of Summons on Defendant: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell (Duree, David)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Court hereby orders as follows: 1. That Defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC is hereby enjoined from selling or otherwise disposing of Plaintiffs David and Kyong Mizells household goods and furnishings; 2. That Plaintiffs shall enter bond in the amount of $500.00 before close of business on October 17, 2018; 3. That this Order shall remain in effect until October 29, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/15/18. (KJS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Declaration of Christein Stith by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Duree, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2018 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kyong Mizell, David Mizell. The plaintiff has until October 12, 2018 @ 3:00pm to provide additional information/cases in regards to the TRO by filing a supplemental memorandum. Matter is taken under submission. (Court Reporter:Susan Moran, Susan_Moran@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7983) (FTR Gold: No) (AAS)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. #3 ] is set for Friday, October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10N before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/09/2018. (AAS)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Hearing: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Duree, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Requesting Hearing on Motino for Temporary Restraining Order: by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Hearing on October 8, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Autrey (Duree, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order For a Temporary Restraining Order)(Duree, David)
October 5, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney David Duree. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs David Mizell, Kyong Mizell Process Server: Steve Bostick or Mark Heffernan (Duree, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC with receipt number 0865-6798246, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by David Mizell, Kyong Mizell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Duree, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizell et al v. Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mizell
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyong Mizell
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Transportation Solutions, LLC
Represented By: G. Keith Phoenix
Represented By: Stephen William Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?