Weinbach v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lana J Weinbach and Lana Weinbach
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., as successor-in-interest by merger to Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01723
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motions by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John) filed by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/07/2018. (AAS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motions by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #12 MOTION for Costs and to Stay the Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Compliance by Plaintiff Lana Weinbach. (Brockland, Michael) filed by Lana Weinbach ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/27/18. (CLA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #12 MOTION for Costs and to Stay the Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Compliance by Plaintiff Lana Weinbach. (Brockland, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John) filed by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC, #17 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John) filed by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/19/2018. (AAS)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Defendants Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Marriott International, Inc.. (Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION for Costs and to Stay the Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Compliance filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Deposition of Scott Harper, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D - University City Citation, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E - University City Hearing Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F - Demolition Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit Exhibit G - Stipulation for Dismissal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit H - Affidavit of Counsel, #8 Exhibit Exhibit I - Complaint)(Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Costs and to Stay the Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Compliance by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Rahoy for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Rahoy, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Michael A. Brockland. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(AAS)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Lana Weinbach Process Server: Midwest Process Service, LLC (Brockland, Michael)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Lana Weinbach Process Server: Midwest Process Service, LLC (Brockland, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Lana Weinbach (Brockland, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Lana Weinbach (Brockland, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above-styled and numbered case filed on October 9, 2018. A review of the case reflects that the Original Filing Form filed by counsel for plaintiff, indicates that a significantly similar complaint was previously filed in this Court as case number 4:16-cv-00783-JCH and assigned to the Honorable Jean C. Hamilton, United States District Judge. This case will therefore be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Jean C. Hamilton, United States District Judge. (MFG)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 10, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lana J Weinbach. (Brockland, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lana J Weinbach. (Brockland, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6803179, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lana J Weinbach.(Brockland, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinbach v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., as successor-in-interest by merger to Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana J Weinbach
Represented By: Michael A. Brockland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Weinbach
Represented By: Michael A. Brockland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?