Whitley v. Borja et al
Plaintiff: Carol A Whitley and Carol A. Whitley
Defendant: Lauren Mann, Kip Billerback, James Ciroli, Phillip K Gebhardt, Flagstar Bank, FSB, Cynthia Wooverton, Millsap & Singer PC, Steven Hennelly, Vernon D. Singer, Providence Capital One, LLC, Paul Borja, Lauren L. Mann, Steven D. Hennelly, Phillip Gebhardt and Does 1-99
Case Number: 4:2018cv01724
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is to show cause why this Court should not grant Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Case [Doc #16 ] within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2018.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/03/2018. (AAS)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 29. Mon Dec 3 16:25:43 CST 2018 (Shepard, Alicia)
November 30, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Carol A. Whitley. (Attachments: #1 True Bill)(AAS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Providence Capital One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Briner, Shawn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Providence Capital One, LLC. (Briner, Shawn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Kip Billerback, Steven D. Hennelly, Lauren L. Mann, Millsap & Singer PC, Vernon D. Singer, Cynthia Wooverton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pullium, Charles)
October 30, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Kip Billerback, Steven D. Hennelly, Lauren L. Mann, Millsap & Singer PC, Vernon D. Singer, Cynthia Wooverton. (Pullium, Charles)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: as to Providence Capital One, LLC Re: #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Providence Capital One, LLC ; ADDITIONAL TIME GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 30, 2018. (Providence Capital One, LLC answer due 11/30/2018.) Signed by Arbitrator on 10/24/18. (KJS)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 23. Wed Oct 24 14:28:03 CDT 2018 (Shirley, Kelley)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary W. Giles for Defendant Providence Capital One, LLC. (Giles, Mary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Providence Capital One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Briner, Shawn)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Shawn T. Briner for Defendant Providence Capital One, LLC. (Briner, Shawn)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Kip Billerback, Steven D. Hennelly, Lauren L. Mann, Millsap & Singer PC, Vernon D. Singer, Cynthia Wooverton. (Pullium, Charles) filed by Cynthia Wooverton, Lauren L. Mann, Steven D. Hennelly, Vernon D. Singer, Kip Billerback, Millsap & Singer PC ; ADDITIONAL TIME GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING OCTOBER 30, 2018; HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/17/18. (CLA)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 19. Wed Oct 17 12:37:57 CDT 2018 (Abrams, Carrie)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Kip Billerback, Steven D. Hennelly, Lauren L. Mann, Millsap & Singer PC, Vernon D. Singer, Cynthia Wooverton. (Pullium, Charles)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Paul Borja, James Ciroli, Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Opinion, Memorandum and Order)(Canter, Anne)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Paul Borja, James Ciroli, Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Canter, Anne)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit with the Clerk's Office in paper format by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Pending Motions at Removal)(Canter, Anne)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB Sent To: State Court - Executed (Canter, Anne)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above-styled and numbered case was removed from St. Louis CountyCircuit Court on October 9, 2018. A review of the case reflects that the Original Filing Form filed by counsel for plaintiff, indicates that a significantly similar complaint was previously filed in this Court as case number 4:17-cv-02075-HEA and assigned to the Honorable Henry E. Autrey, United States District Judge. This case will therefore be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Henry E. Autrey, United States District Judge. (MFG)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 13. Thu Oct 11 09:19:48 CDT 2018 (Gaines, Mavis)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summonses and returns to defendants and other documents filed in the state court matter)(Canter, Anne)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Consent to Removal by Defendants Kip Billerback, Steven D. Hennelly, Lauren L. Mann, Millsap & Singer PC, Vernon D. Singer, Cynthia Wooverton. (Pullium, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Millsap & Singer PC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Pullium, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles S. Pullium for Defendants Kip Billerback, Steven D. Hennelly, Lauren L. Mann, Millsap & Singer PC, Vernon D. Singer, Cynthia Wooverton. (Pullium, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Removal of Defendant Gebhardt, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal of Defendant Providence Capital One, LLC)(Canter, Anne)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. re: #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Canter, Anne)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. Parent companies: Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Subsidiaries: No, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Canter, Anne)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. Parent companies: Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Subsidiaries: No, Publicly held company: No,. (Canter, Anne)
October 10, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Carol A. Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MFG) .
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court at St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 18SL-CC02930, with receipt number 0865-6803459, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by James Ciroli, Paul Borja, Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Trustees Deed of Foreclosure)(Canter, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley v. Borja et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Billerback
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ciroli
Represented By: Anne Michelle Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip K Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Anne Michelle Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Wooverton
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millsap & Singer PC
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hennelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon D. Singer
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Capital One, LLC
Represented By: Mary W. Giles
Represented By: Shawn T. Briner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Borja
Represented By: Anne Michelle Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren L. Mann
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Hennelly
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?