Sharrock v. Ramey
Petitioner: David Sharrock
Respondent: Eileen Ramey
Case Number: 4:2018cv01751
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Mon Dec 10 14:45:08 CST 2018 (Shepard, Alicia)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for writ of mandamus against the Missouri State Courts relative to charging filings fees for state habeas corpus actions [Doc. #8 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/10/2018. (AAS)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Mon Dec 10 14:39:10 CST 2018 (Shepard, Alicia)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for recusal [Doc. #7 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/10/2018. (AAS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MISSOURI CIVIL FILING FEES INMISSOURI STATE HABEAS CORPUS SHOULD NOT BE ENJOINED 28 USC 1651A by Petitioner David Sharrock. (AAS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION TO RECUSE JUDGES EASTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI by Petitioner David Sharrock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AAS)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Thu Nov 29 15:37:11 CST 2018 (Abrams, Carrie)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioners application for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 is DENIED AND DISMISSED AS TIME-BARRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/29/19. (CLA)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Thu Nov 29 15:35:26 CST 2018 (Abrams, Carrie)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioners application for writ of habeas corpus [Doc. #1] is DENIED AND DISMISSED AS TIME-BARRED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no certificate of appealability shall issue. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/29/18. (CLA)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Thu Oct 18 12:34:38 CDT 2018 (Abrams, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioners motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall show cause, in writing and no later than thirty days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed as time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed. #2 ( Response to Court due by 11/18/2018.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/18/18. (CLA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 15, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Oct 15 11:02:42 CDT 2018 (admin,)
October 15, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
October 15, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner David Sharrock. (JWD)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner David Sharrock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Order Regarding Notice of Appeal, #3 Exhibit C - Request Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Vacate, #5 Exhibit E - Motion to Appeal IFP, #6 Exhibit F - Judgment, #7 Exhibit H - Supplemental Judgment, #8 Table of Exhibits, #9 Envelope, #10 Correspondence)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharrock v. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eileen Ramey
Represented By: Caroline M. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?