Bouzeanes et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Richard Richards, Olivier Durand, Danny White, Daphnie Lattimore, Denton Bray, Robert Rauh, George Bouzeanes, Steve Vitale, George Yaekle, Angela Ezell, Charlotte Morton, Freddie Martin, Kay Elmes, Frank Morton, Frank Lattimore, Michael Campbell, Melissa White, William Pelicot, Edward Zabolotny, Johanne Durand, Richard Ham, Frederick Forward, Hans Elmer, Steven Ezell, Warren Garnier and Donald Hurt
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv01806
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hansell, Erik)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Corrigan, James)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Corrigan, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and/or Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Corrigan, James)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Corrigan, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Expedite filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hansell, Erik)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (KXS)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court and/or in the Alternative, Motion for Temporary Stay Pending JPML Transfer Ruling filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hansell, Erik)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and/or Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CTO-108)(Corrigan, James)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Corrigan, James)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Corrigan, James)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs George Bouzeanes, Denton Bray, Michael Campbell, Johanne Durand, Olivier Durand, Hans Elmer, Kay Elmes, Angela Ezell, Steven Ezell, Frederick Forward, Warren Garnier, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Daphnie Lattimore, Frank Lattimore, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Frank Morton, William Pelicot, Robert Rauh, Richard Richards, Steve Vitale, Danny White, Melissa White, George Yaekle, Edward Zabolotny. (Corrigan, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Proposed Order) (ARL).
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hansell, Erik)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Hansell, Erik)
October 25, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Frank Lattimore, William Pelicot, Steven Ezell, Melissa White, Michael Campbell, Denton Bray, Robert Rauh, George Bouzeanes, Frederick Forward, Edward Zabolotny, Richard Richards, Frank Morton, Danny White, Kay Elmes, Olivier Durand, Warren Garnier, Daphnie Lattimore, Steve Vitale, Freddie Martin, Charlotte Morton, Angela Ezell, Johanne Durand, George Yaekle, Richard Ham, Donald Hurt, Hans Elmer.(BAK)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Docket sheet. (BAK)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Hansell, Erik)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 18SL-CC03814, with receipt number 0865-6835867, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Hansell, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouzeanes et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Richards
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivier Durand
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny White
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphnie Lattimore
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denton Bray
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rauh
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bouzeanes
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Vitale
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Yaekle
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ezell
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Morton
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Martin
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Elmes
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Morton
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lattimore
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Campbell
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa White
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pelicot
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Zabolotny
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanne Durand
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ham
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Forward
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Elmer
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ezell
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Garnier
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hurt
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Erik L. Hansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?