Sedlmayr v United States of America

Plaintiff: John R Sedmayr and John R. Sedlmayr
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv01826
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. 3] is GRANTED to and including February 14, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/21/18. (ALM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aberg, Eric)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John R. Sedlmayr. John R. Sedlmayr served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Kutten, James)
October 26, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued to US Attorney and US Attorney General. The summons were emailed to attorney James Allan Kutten. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant JOHN R SEDLMAYR with receipt number 0865-6840622, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by JOHN R SEDLMAYR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kutten, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sedlmayr v United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Martin Aberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Sedmayr
Represented By: James Allan Kutten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Sedlmayr
Represented By: James Allan Kutten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?