Merlenbach v. FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Rita Merlenbach
Defendant: FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC d/b/a Crystal Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center and FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01834
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Rita Merlenbach. . (Hoffman, Megen)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to continue #11 is granted and the conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is reset from December 18, 2018 to Friday, December 21, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. in my chambers 16- South. The joint proposed scheduling plan is now due on or before December 14, 2018. Counsel are expected to appear in person for the scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/27/2018. (CLO)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue /Reschedule Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Rita Merlenbach. (Hoffman, Megen)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/11/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/18/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2018. (AAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC.(Claiborne, Carrie)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Claiborne, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC. (Claiborne, Carrie) filed by FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Answer deadline extended until 11/9/18. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/1/18. (ARL)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC. (Claiborne, Carrie)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Tomaso for Defendant FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC. (Tomaso, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Rita Merlenbach.(MFG)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC d/b/a Crystal Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center Sent To: Plaintiff (Claiborne, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC d/b/a Crystal Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center. Parent companies: LaSalle Holdings, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. (Claiborne, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, MO, case number 18SL-CC03337, with receipt number 0865-6841489, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC d/b/a Crystal Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Claiborne, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merlenbach v. FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Merlenbach
Represented By: Richard Andrew Barry, III
Represented By: Megen I. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC d/b/a Crystal Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Carrie A. Claiborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLO-GP Leasing Company, LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Claiborne
Represented By: Robert J. Tomaso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?