Hamilton v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ann Hamilton
Defendant: Barbara Gardner, Automobile Club of Missouri, Cortez Thurmond and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv01841
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ann Hamilton; GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/18/2018. (AAS)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ann Hamilton (Tate, Rufus)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall respond to both Motions to Dismiss, in writing, by Monday, December 17, 2018, and should the Plaintiff fail to respond, that the Court will rule on the Motions to Dismiss, (ECF Nos. #6 , #13 ), unopposed. Response to Court due by 12/17/2018.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/10/2018. (AAS)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wiltshire, Adama)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wiltshire, Adama)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Automobile Club of Missouri. Parent companies: Automobile Club of Southern California, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Farrell, Julia)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (National Railroad Passenger Corporation answer due 11/19/2018.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/1/18. (KJS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Responsive Pleading) by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wiltshire, Adama)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Adama Kemba Wiltshire for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wiltshire, Adama)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wiltshire, Adama)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Consent to Removal by Defendant Automobile Club of Missouri. (MFG)
October 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant Automobile Club of Missouri's Motion to Dismiss and Suggestions in Support by Defendant Automobile Club of Missouri. (MFG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ann Hamilton.(MFG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Patricia J. Martin for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Martin, Patricia)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Wiltshire, Adama)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: The United States holds, through the U.S. Secretary of Transportation, 100% of Amtrak's preferred stock (109,396,994 shares at $100 par value). Amtrak's common stock (9,385,694 shares at $10 par value) is held by American Premier Underwriters, Inc. (55.8%; a wholly owned, not publicly traded, subsidiary of American Financial Group, Inc., which is publicly traded), Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC (35.7%; BNSF LLC is a wholly-owned, not publicly traded, subsidiary of Berkshire Hathaway, which is publicly traded) Canadian Pacific Railway (6.3%), and Canadian National Railway (2.2%). None of Amtrak's stock is publicly traded.,. (Wiltshire, Adama)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri, case number 1822-CC10861, with receipt number 0865-6842809, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Receipt of Service, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Notice to Circuit Court Clerk, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Notice to Adverse Party, #5 Exhibit Ex E - Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit Ex F - Pending Motions in State Court, #7 Original Filing Form Ex G - Original Filing Form, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Ex H - Civil Cover Sheet)(Wiltshire, Adama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Club of Missouri
Represented By: Julia Todd Farrell
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Thurmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Adama Kemba Wiltshire
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Hamilton
Represented By: Rufus J. Tate, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?