CAA Sports LLC v. Dogra
Plaintiff: CAA Sports LLC
Defendant: Ben Dogra
Case Number: 4:2018cv01887
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Count III of Dogra's Counterclaim by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Sur-Reply)(Oncidi, Anthony)
December 27, 2018 Filing 48 SURREPLY to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Count III of Dogra Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra. (JMC)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #46 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Comerford, John) filed by Ben Dogra ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/27/2018. (JMC)
December 26, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Comerford, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Count III of Dogra Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Weinstein, Alex)
December 21, 2018 Filing 44 AMENDED ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Weinstein, Alex)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto) filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that CAA Sports LLC.'s motion to seal (#4) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The clerk is direct to unseal CAA Sports' Petition to Vacate and Exhibit A attached thereto, as well as CAA Sports' Motion to Vacate and Exhibit A attached thereto. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/20/2018. (JMC)
December 14, 2018 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Count III of Dogra Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra. (Comerford, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Anthony J. Oncidi. (Oncidi, Anthony) Address updated in CM/ECF on 12/13/2018 (CMC).
December 12, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Count III of Dogra Counterclaims by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Weinstein, Alex)
December 12, 2018 Filing 39 ANSWER to Counterclaim by CAA Sports LLC.(Weinstein, Alex)
December 12, 2018 Filing 38 SURRESPONSE to Motion re #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (CSG)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #36 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply In Opposition to Motion to Vacate Fourth Supplemental Opinion and Award by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Sur-Reply)(Oncidi, Anthony) filed by CAA Sports LLC ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/12/18. (CSG)
December 11, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply In Opposition to Motion to Vacate Fourth Supplemental Opinion and Award by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Sur-Reply)(Oncidi, Anthony)
December 10, 2018 Filing 35 SURREPLY to Motion re #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award filed by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (CSG)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #33 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum by Defendant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Comerford, John) filed by Ben Dogra ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/10/18. (CSG)
December 7, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum by Defendant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Comerford, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 32 SURRESPONSE to Sur-Reply to Motion re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto), #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (CSG)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Dogra's Sur-reply in Opposition to CAA's Motion to Seal by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Sur-reply)(Brenner, Guy) filed by CAA Sports LLC; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/6/18. (CSG)
December 5, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC, Counter Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Weinstein, Alex)
November 30, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Dogra's Sur-reply in Opposition to CAA's Motion to Seal by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Sur-reply)(Brenner, Guy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 28 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto) filed by Defendant Ben Dogra. (MRS) Modified on 12/6/2018 (CSG).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #26 MOTION for Leave to In Opposition to CAA's Motion to Seal File a Sur-Reply by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply)(Comerford, John) filed by Ben Dogra ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/30/18. (MRS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to file response In Opposition to CAA's Motion to Seal File a Sur-Reply by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply)(Comerford, John) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JMC).
November 28, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto) filed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Brenner, Guy)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award - Unopposed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Brenner, Guy) filed by CAA Sports LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 12/5/2018.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/27/2018. (JMC)
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award - Unopposed by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Brenner, Guy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric David Block for Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Block, Eric)
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Erik O. Solverud for Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Solverud, Erik)
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Henry Lattinville for Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Lattinville, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award filed by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Comerford, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto) filed by Counter Claimant Ben Dogra, Defendant Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Comerford, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff CAA Sports LLC by Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Comerford, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by James B. Martin for Defendant Ben Dogra. (Martin, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Comerford for Defendant Ben Dogra. (Comerford, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendant Ben Dogra. (Bennett, James)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex C. Weinstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6863826) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weinstein, Alex) filed by CAA Sports LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/2018. (JMC)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Guy Brenner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6863812) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brenner, Guy) filed by CAA Sports LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/2018. (JMC)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony J. Oncidi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6863757) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oncidi, Anthony) filed by CAA Sports LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/2018. (JMC)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: ORDERED - Order granting motion to seal petition (#4) is withdrawn. The Court will take the motion under advisement. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/2018. (JMC)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex C. Weinstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6863826) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weinstein, Alex)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Guy Brenner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6863812) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brenner, Guy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony J. Oncidi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6863757) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oncidi, Anthony)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (WITHDRAWN) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Jellinek, Charles) filed by CAA Sports LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/6/2018. (JMC) Modified on 11/8/2018 (JMC).
November 6, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Charles B. Jellinek. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 SEALED MOTION to Vacate Opinion and Award by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jellinek, Charles)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Petition to Vacate, Mot to Vacate and Exhibits thereto) by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC. (Jellinek, Charles) Modified on 11/8/2018 (JMC).
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC Process Server: Scott Biondo (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Jellinek, Charles)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff CAA Sports LLC.. (Jellinek, Charles)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Opinion and Award against defendant Ben Dogra with receipt number 0865-6858344, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jellinek, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAA Sports LLC v. Dogra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Dogra
Represented By: John D. Comerford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James B. Martin
Represented By: Robert Henry Lattinville
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAA Sports LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Represented By: Anthony J. Oncidi
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Alex C. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?