United States of America v. $6,200.00 U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $6,200.00 U.S. Currency and $6,290.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2018cv01889
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted (11/21/18 - Awaiting delivery) party being served: Sibyl Ennis, Type of return Complaint & Notice, (KKS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted ; attempted to serve Sibyl Ennis, Type of return Complaint & Notice; Unclaimed - unable to forward (KKS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted ; attempted to serve Deandre Brett, Type of return Complaint & Notice; Unclaimed - unable to forward (KKS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Rahman Keyes (#46688-044), Type of return Complaint & Notice, Delivered 11/23/18 (KKS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Michael S. Ghidina, Type of return Complaint & Notice, Delivered 11/21/18 (KKS)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Casey, Stephen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return executed; $6,290.00 U.S. Currency in USMS custody; warrant and complaint served on asset on 11/19/18 (KXS)
November 13, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $6,290.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK)
November 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Forfeitureof Forfeiture against defendant $6,200.00 U.S. Currency Amendment to #1 Complaint of Forfeitureof Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Casey, Stephen)
November 6, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $6,200.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $6,200.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Casey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $6,200.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,200.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,290.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?