City of Webster Groves, MO v. CCATT LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Webster Groves, Missouri and City of Webster Groves, MO
Defendant: CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01910
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand (ECF No. 28) is GRANTED up to and including January 11, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/27/18. (THL)
December 26, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand ;Extension to file the following: Reply in Support of Motion to Remand ;Proposed extension date January 11, 2019 by Plaintiff City of Webster Groves, MO. (Eveker, Margaret) (Main Document 28 replaced on 12/26/2018) (LMR).
December 21, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Saint Louis County, Missouri filed by Counter Claimant CCATT LLC, Defendants CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paula Phillips)(Victoria, Richard)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #24 ) is GRANTED and the case is STAYED pending the Court's resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. (ECF No. #20 ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order Setting Rule 16 Conference (ECF No. #19 ) is VACATED and the Rule 16 Conference, previously set for January 4, 2019, is CANCELED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/20/2018. (KCB)
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff City of Webster Groves, MO. (Streubel, David)
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff City of Webster Groves, MO. (Streubel, David)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants CCATT LLC and Crown Castle International Corp.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 22) is GRANTED up to and including December 21, 2018. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/13/18. (THL)
December 12, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Saint Louis County, Missouri by Defendants CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. (Wacker, Brian)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Saint Louis County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff City of Webster Groves, MO. (Eveker, Margaret)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Saint Louis County, Missouri by Plaintiff City of Webster Groves, MO. (Eveker, Margaret)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/28/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/4/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/3/2018. (AFC)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff CCATT LLC by CCATT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Webster Groves Leas, #2 Exhibit B-First Amendment to Lease, #3 Exhibit C-Default Notice, #4 Exhibit D-Letter to Vogel, #5 Exhibit E-Letter to Ebken, #6 Exhibit F-Letter to Vogel, #7 Exhibit G-Letter, #8 Exhibit H-Letter to Vogel)(Wacker, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Webster Groves Leas, #2 Exhibit B-First Amendment to Lease, #3 Exhibit C-Default Notice, #4 Exhibit D-Letter to Ebken, #5 Exhibit E-Letter)(Wacker, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM re #15 Answer to Complaint Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Maher, Luke)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Verified Petition by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.(Maher, Luke)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by David Alvin Streubel for Plaintiff City of Webster Groves, MO. (Streubel, David)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Richard T. Victoria's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 12) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/19/18. (THL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard T. Victoria. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6880316) by Defendants CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Victoria, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel S. Peters for Defendants CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. (Peters, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Petition and Memorandum in Support (ECF No. 6) is GRANTED to and including November 30, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants CCATT LLC and Crown Castle International Corp.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED to and including November 30, 2018. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/14/18. (THL)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendants CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wacker, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants CCATT LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal)(Wacker, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Petition and Memorandum in Support by Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Maher, Luke)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 Consent to Removal by Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Maher, Luke)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Luke G. Maher for Defendant New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Maher, Luke)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Crown Castle International Corp.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wacker, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CCATT LLC. Parent companies: Not Applicable, Subsidiaries: Not Applicable, Publicly held company: Not Applicable,. (Wacker, Brian)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by City of Webster Groves, MO.(MFG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 18SL-CC03548, with receipt number 0865-6869046, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Crown Castle International Corp., CCATT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Civil Court File, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wacker, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Webster Groves, MO v. CCATT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCATT LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Represented By: Daniel S. Peters
Represented By: Richard Todd Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Castle International Corp.
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Represented By: Daniel S. Peters
Represented By: Richard Todd Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Represented By: Luke G. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Webster Groves, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Webster Groves, MO
Represented By: Margaret Claire Eveker
Represented By: David Alvin Streubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?