McCall v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Francine L. McCall
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv01951
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Francine L. McCall. (KCB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Francine L. McCall re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (BRP)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Francine McCall re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Clerk mailed this letter along with new form this date. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/18/2018.) (AFC)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
November 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (AFC)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Wed Nov 21 11:19:44 CST 2018 (Cordray, Abby)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/21/2018. (AFC)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/21/2018. (AFC)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 19, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Nov 19 17:00:38 CST 2018 (admin,)
November 19, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 19, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Francine L. McCall. (JWD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Francine L. McCall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Medical records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(JWD)Clerk's note: Attachment #1 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers and medical records.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine L. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?