Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Moore and Virginia Carter
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01962
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan (ECF No. 19) is GRANTED up to and including January 24, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Rule 16 Conference is set for January 31, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/10/19. (THL)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan by Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Cornfeld, Richard)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Scott Levy for Plaintiffs Virginia Carter, George Moore. (Levy, Daniel) (The address has been updated in CM/ECF.) Modified on 1/11/2019 (LMR).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) is GRANTED up to and including January 31, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/2/19. (THL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Scavotto, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs no Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued no, Consents issued no, Jury demand, , filed by George Moore, Virginia Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cornfeld, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen to District Judge Ronnie L. White. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (EAB)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 3. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/10/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/30/18. (EAB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Scavotto, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scavotto, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandria D. Bond by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.; #7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph C. Wylie II) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. and #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul W. Sweeney Jr. by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. ; ORDERED: Motions are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on November 26, 2018. (MCB)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandria D. Bond. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6890999) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bond, Alexandria)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul W. Sweeney Jr.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6890954) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sweeney, Paul)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph C. Wylie II. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6890915) by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Wylie, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jaclyn Niccole Warr for Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Warr, Jaclyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by George Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MFG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc., d/b/a Canteen. Parent companies: Compass Group PLC, Publicly held company: no,. (Scavotto, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc., d/b/a Canteen Sent To: Plaintiff (Scavotto, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1822-CC11485, with receipt number 0865-6888185, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., d/b/a Canteen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scavotto, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Scavotto
Represented By: Jaclyn Niccole Warr
Represented By: Joseph C. Wylie, II
Represented By: Paul W. Sweeney, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandria D. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Moore
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Carter
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?