City of Springfield, Missouri et al v. T-Mobile Central, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri and City of Lee's Summit, Missouri
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile Central, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02015
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the County of Saint Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri ; GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/18/19. (KJS)
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the County of Saint Louis, Missouri filed by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Wuller, Lindsay)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret) filed by City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri; SUBJECT TO THE RULING ON THE MOTION TO REMAND ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRNATED UP TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 18, 2019. #19 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret) filed by City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri ; THE MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/14/19. (KJS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (KJS)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memo in Support & Exhibits)(Leadlove, Mark) filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. ; LEAVE TO FILE IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/8/19. (KJS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo in Support & Exhibits)(Leadlove, Mark)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Leadlove, Mark)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the County of Saint Louis, Missouri, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Wuller, Lindsay) filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 14, 2019; HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/3/19. (CLA)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the County of Saint Louis, Missouri, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Wuller, Lindsay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the County of Saint Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support)(Eveker, Margaret)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the County of Saint Louis, Missouri by Plaintiffs City of Grandview, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Webster Groves, Missouri. (Eveker, Margaret)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Parent companies: T-Mobile US, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wuller, Lindsay)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant T-Mobile US, Inc.. Parent companies: Deutsch Telekom AG, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Deutsch Telekom AG,. (Wuller, Lindsay)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant T-Mobile Central, LLC.. (Wuller, Lindsay)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan B. Potts for Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Potts, Jonathan)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Leadlove, Mark) filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/10/18. (CLA)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay Erin Wuller for Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Wuller, Lindsay)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Leadlove, Mark)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by City of Webster Groves, Missouri, City of Springfield, Missouri, City of Lee's Summit, Missouri, City of Grandview, Missouri.(BAK)
December 3, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants T-Mobile Central, LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Leadlove, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 18SL-CC02864, with receipt number 0865-6902611, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile Central, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Civil Cover Sheet )(Leadlove, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Springfield, Missouri et al v. T-Mobile Central, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mark B. Leadlove
Represented By: Lindsay Erin Wuller
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Mark B. Leadlove
Represented By: Lindsay Erin Wuller
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile Central, LLC
Represented By: Mark B. Leadlove
Represented By: Lindsay Erin Wuller
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Grandview, Missouri
Represented By: David Alvin Streubel
Represented By: Margaret Claire Eveker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Springfield, Missouri
Represented By: David Alvin Streubel
Represented By: Margaret Claire Eveker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Webster Groves, Missouri
Represented By: David Alvin Streubel
Represented By: Margaret Claire Eveker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lee's Summit, Missouri
Represented By: David Alvin Streubel
Represented By: Margaret Claire Eveker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?