Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois et al v. Neidorff et al
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund and Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, Frederick H Eppinger, John R. Roberts, Vicki B Escarra, David L. Steward, Orlando Ayala, Robert K. Ditmore, Tommy G. Thompson, Michael F. Neidorff, Centene Corporation and Richard A Gephardt
Case Number: 4:2018cv02085
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric S. Berelovich: ORDERED GRANTED; and this Order also grants pro hac admission to counsel Berelovich in Case No. 4:18cv113 without the need for further motion.. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/9/19. (CDP)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois and Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund's Motion to Consolidate and Amend Scheduling Order [30 in 4:18CV113 CDP] is granted in all respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, et al. v. Neidorff, et al., Case No. 4:18CV2085 RLW, is consolidated into this action for all purposes. All further filings shall be filed in Case No. 4:18CV113 CDP only. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close Case No. 4:18CV2085 RLW after docketing a copy of this Order in that case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule [29 in 4:18CV113 CDP] is amended to specifically include and apply in all respects to counsel for plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois and Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. Competing plaintiffs counsel are granted to January 16, 2019, by which to meet and confer and attempt to resolve their competing claims to be lead plaintiff and lead counsel. In all other respects, the schedule, conditions, and deadlines set out in the Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule remain in full force and effect. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/9/2019. (CBL)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric S. Berelovich. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6959443) by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Berelovich Certificate of Good Standing)(Berelovich, Eric)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Carol Valerie Gilden's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/4/19. (JEB)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Carol V. Gilden. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6958003) by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Gilden Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilden, Carol)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund with case number 4:18-cv-113 (Attachments: #1 Motion to Consolidate)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT re 5 Docket Text Order by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal the Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Rule 13.05(A) (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/17/18. (JEB)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund.. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 11 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Jamie L. Reyes-Jones. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Derivatively and on Behalf of the Nominal Defendant Centene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Derivatively and on Behalf of the Nominal Defendant Centene Corporation Process Server: Jonh Frederick Investigations (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6928104, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Derivatively and on Behalf of the Nominal Defendant Centene Corporation, Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Attachment Disclosure Orginizational Interest, #4 Summons Roberts , #5 Summons Schwanek , #6 Summons Eppinger , #7 Summons Steward , #8 Summons Escarra , #9 Summons Thompson , #10 Summons Ditmore , #11 Summons Gephardt , #12 Summons Ayala , #13 Summons Neidorf , #14 Summons Centene)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois et al v. Neidorff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick H Eppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki B Escarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Ditmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Neidorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Gephardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Carol Valerie Gilden
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Carol Valerie Gilden
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?