Baechle v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Linda S. Baechle
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv02121
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Linda S. Baechle, Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (KEK)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Plaintiff Linda S. Baechle. (Rund, Jane)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Linda S. Baechle. Defendant SSA Office of General Counsel served on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Dempsey, Vicki)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 12/21/18. (KEK)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 20, 2018 Amended Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued under Eastern Division case number. The summons was emailed to Vicki A. Dempsey. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CLERKS ORDER (GJL).. The above styled and numbered case was opened on December 19, 2018 and assigned to the Northern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Eastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Eastern Division and randomly assigned to the Honorable John M. Bodenhausen, United States Magistrate Judge, under cause number 4:18-cv-02121-JMB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 2:18-cv-00114-HEA be administratively closed. (MFG)
December 20, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Vicki A. Dempsey. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number 0865-6935593, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Linda S Baechle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baechle v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Baechle
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?