Cook v. SAF-Holland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tony Cook
Defendant: SAF-Holland, Inc., Ms. Mary Brown and Mary C. Brown
Case Number: 4:2018cv02140
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Rule 16 Conference (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously scheduled for February 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELED. If necessary, the Court will reschedule the Rule 16 Conference and order the parties to submit an amended joint proposed scheduling plan after it rules on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. #10 ). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/4/2019. (AFC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. . (Vogan, Joseph)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 ORAL MOTION Request for Oral Argument Re: Motion for Remand by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Vogan, Joseph)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit filed by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA, #2 Exhibit B - Leave of Absence Guidelines, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Leave of Absence)(Vogan, Joseph)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Rule 16 Order, Defendants and by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit filed by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/1/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/8/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/03/2019. (KCB) Modified on 1/3/2019 (KCB).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Joseph J. Vogan's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 6) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/2/19. (THL)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc..(Holland, James)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph J. Vogan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6950802) by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Vogan, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Holland, James)
December 27, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Petition (JWD)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant SAF-Holland, Inc.. Parent companies: SAF-HOLLAND gmbH, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (JWD)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Warren County Circuit Court, filed by Tony Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MCHR Charging Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - MCHR Letter)(JWD)Clerk's note: Exhibit #1 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers.
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Judicial Circuit, case number 17BB-CC00056, with receipt number 0865-6944766, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mary Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Labor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Leave of Absence Guidelines, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Leave, #5 Exhibit E - Circuit Court Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form, #8 Attachment Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate)(Holland, James) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 6 replaced on 12/27/2018 to correct PDF error) (JWD). Clerk's note: attachment #5 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. SAF-Holland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAF-Holland, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Holland, II
Represented By: Joseph J. Vogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Mary Brown
Represented By: James R. Holland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C. Brown
Represented By: James R. Holland, II
Represented By: Joseph J. Vogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Cook
Represented By: Gregory E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?