Kilroy Was Here, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Hendricks Volk, Tammy Hinds, Randall Arthur, Barbara Ann Estivo, John DeSousa, Kurt Volk, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Jeffrey Maxvill, Shelly Goodman, Janet Martinez, Brenda Arthur, Brenda Randall, Arthur Randall and Barbara Estivo
Defendant: Brian McBrearty, Starr Indemnity and Liability Company and McBrearty Huck
Case Number: 4:2018cv02157
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill. (Muchnick, Todd)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald)
February 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Motion to Disqualify Certain Counsel for Plaintiffs] Todd A. Muchnick, Aaron D. Haber, Gregory L. Shevlin & Brent L. Martin by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court [Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand] filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald)
January 29, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall. (Zevan, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan) filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 2/12/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/24/2019. (JMC)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Defendant Brian McBrearty. (Bronsky, Albert)
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Brian McBrearty. (Bronsky, Albert)
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Defendant Brian McBrearty. (Bronsky, Albert)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court in the Circuit Court of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Muchnick, Todd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to attorney Gregory L. Shevlin from Clerk re: Admission Pro Hac Vice. (CSG)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to attorney Brent L. Martin from Clerk Re:Admission to Practice. (CSG)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Wed Jan 2 14:28:47 CST 2019 (Gould, Cathy)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Starr Indemnity's Motion to Dismiss Counts II and VI of Petition by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd) filed by Kurt Volk, Arthur Randall, John DeSousa, Janet Martinez, Barbara Estivo, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Jeffrey Maxvill, Shelly Goodman, Brenda Randall, Tammy Hinds ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/2/19. (CSG)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Starr Indemnity's Motion to Dismiss Counts II and VI of Petition by Plaintiffs John DeSousa, Barbara Estivo, Shelly Goodman, Tammy Hinds, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Brenda Randall, Kelly Hendricks Volk, Kurt Volk. (Muchnick, Todd)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company [St. Louis City Circuit Clerk's Acknowledgement of Notice of Removal] Sent To: State Court - Executed (Greiman, Gerald)
January 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Kelly Hendricks Volk, Shelly Goodman, Brenda Randall, John DeSousa, Jeffrey Maxvill, Arthur Randall, Barbara Estivo, Kilroy Was Here, LLC, Janet Martinez, Tammy Hinds, Kurt Volk.(BAK)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VI of Petition by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Greiman, Gerald)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company.(Greiman, Gerald)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Megan D. Meadows for Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Meadows, Megan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. Parent companies: Starr Global Financial, Inc., Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Starr Global Holdings AG, Starr International Company, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Greiman, Gerald)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company [Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal] Sent To: Plaintiff (Greiman, Gerald)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1822-CC11663, with receipt number 0865-6949084, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B, Assignment of Claims Contract, #3 Exhibit C, Docket Sheet from Case #1622-CC01190, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Greiman, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilroy Was Here, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Hendricks Volk
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hinds
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Represented By: Brent L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Estivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John DeSousa
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Volk
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kilroy Was Here, LLC
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Represented By: David M. Zevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Maxvill
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Goodman
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Represented By: Gregory L. Shevlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Martinez
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Randall
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Represented By: David M. Zevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Randall
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Represented By: David M. Zevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Estivo
Represented By: Todd I. Muchnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McBrearty
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McBrearty Huck
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?