Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. Michael Wynn et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Mueller, Walter Bazan, Jr., Donald Thomas, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Fred Phillipp, Jr., Gregg Smith, Rich Lucks, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, Mark Borgmann, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, Carl Farrell, Painters District Council No. 58, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Daniel Wienstroer, Joseph Keipp, Tim Weiss and Steve Phillipp, Jr.
Defendant: Pamela Wynn and Michael Wynn
Case Number: 4:2019cv00061
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants by Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Rich Lucks, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Daniel Wienstroer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Gierse, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in His Capacity as Business Manager), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Dane McGraw, Daniel Wienstroer, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Rich Lucks, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Walter Bazan, Jr., Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Joseph Mueller, Joseph Keipp, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Michael Wynn served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Gladney, Samuel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in His Capacity as Business Manager), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Dane McGraw, Daniel Wienstroer, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Rich Lucks, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Walter Bazan, Jr., Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Joseph Mueller, Joseph Keipp, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. (Gladney, Samuel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in His Capacity as Business Manager), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Dane McGraw, Daniel Wienstroer, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Rich Lucks, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Walter Bazan, Jr., Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Joseph Mueller, Joseph Keipp, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Pamela Wynn served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Gladney, Samuel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew J. Gierse for Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Rich Lucks, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Daniel Wienstroer. (Gierse, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Sam K. Gladney. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Rich Lucks, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Daniel Wienstroer Process Server: John Frederick Investigations (Gladney, Samuel)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6980083, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Carl Farrell, Fred Phillipp, Jr, Gregg Smith, Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Dane McGraw, Daniel Wienstroer, Steve Phillipp, Jr, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Rich Lucks, Donald Thomas, Tim Weiss, Walter Bazan, Jr., Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Joseph Mueller, Joseph Keipp, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons Mike Wynn d/b/a Wynn, #4 Summons Summons Pamela Wynn d/b/a Wynn, #5 Summons Summons Pamela Wynn)(Gladney, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. Michael Wynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mueller
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Bazan, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Pension Trust
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Phillipp, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Smith
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Lucks
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane McGraw
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Doerr
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Borgmann
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Farrell
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 58
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wienstroer
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Keipp
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Weiss
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Phillipp, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel K. Gladney
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?