United States of America v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Mark Tony Baker, Brook James Askew and Mark Tony Baker, Sr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00073
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Mark Tony Baker, Sr served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Lee, Julian)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Brook James Askew served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Lee, Julian)
January 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Julian T. A. Lee. (MFG)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Plaintiff United States of America. (MFG)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: McDowell and Associates, LTD (Attachments: #1 Summons Askew, #2 Summons Baker)(MFG)
January 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MFG)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Brook James Askew, Mark Tony Baker Non-Jury Demand,, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tony Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brook James Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tony Baker, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Julian Todd Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?