Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: 0.34 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, City of West Alton, Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County, 0.16 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Sara Stahlschmidt, Glacier Park Liquidating Company, Stahlschmidt Family Trust Dated September 10, 1997 and Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Case Number: 4:2019cv00086
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Referring Judge: David D Noce
2 Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker for Defendants Sara Stahlschmidt, Stahlschmidt Family Trust Dated September 10, 1997. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-RWS-DDN et al.(Walker, Jordan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker for Consolidated Filer Defendants Sara Stahlschmidt, Stahlschmidt Family Trust Dated September 10, 1997. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01327-RWS-DDN, 4:19-cv-00086-RWS-DDN(Walker, Jordan)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be consolidated with 4:18 CV 1327, reassigned to Chief Judge Rodney W. Sippel, and referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order of Consolidation filed in 4:18 CV 1327 be filed in the instant case, and that all future documents be filed in 4:18 CV 1327. Case No. 4:19 CV 86 shall be administratively closed and no further filings will be accepted in this closed case., Terminate Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 1/24/19. (KKS)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION filed in 4:18cv1327. (Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel and referred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Case administratively closed.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/24/19. (KKS)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Eminent Domain against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6991522, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FERC Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plat Map, #4 Attachment - Notice of Condemnation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Meanes, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.34 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.57 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Alton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.16 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Stahlschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Park Liquidating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stahlschmidt Family Trust Dated September 10, 1997
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Pamela J. Meanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?