Turntine et al v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Promotional Services, Inc. and James Turntine
Defendant: Redeye Rhino, LLC and Charles Peterson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00107
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Fifteen Pages (ECF No. 17) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/12/19. (JEB)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 14) is GRANTED until March 1, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/21/19. (JEB)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Fifteen Pages (ECF No. 12) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/21/19. (JEB)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Promotional Services, Inc., James Turntine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of James Turntine, #2 Exhibit Secretary of State Documents, #3 Exhibit 2015 Exclusivity Agreement)(Kistner, Elkin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Promotional Services, Inc., James Turntine. (Kistner, Elkin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Promotional Services, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kistner, Elkin)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED until February 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/7/19. (JEB)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Promotional Services, Inc., James Turntine. (Kistner, Elkin)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Fifteen Pages (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/31/19. (JEB)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Kraushaar, Corey)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC. (Kraushaar, Corey)
January 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by James Turntine, Promotional Services, Inc..(BAK)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Redeye Rhino, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Kraushaar, Corey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Charles Peterson, Redeye Rhino, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Kraushaar, Corey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1822-CC11753, with receipt number 0865-6999993, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Redeye Rhino, LLC, Charles Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Attachment State Court File)(Kraushaar, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turntine et al v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redeye Rhino, LLC
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Peterson
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Promotional Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elkin L. Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Turntine
Represented By: Elkin L. Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?