The City of Berkeley, Missouri et al v. Ferguson-Florissant School District et al
Plaintiff: The City of Berkeley, Missouri, Johnetta Robinson, Lisa Willis, Charvan Jamerson, Willie Mae Anthony and Andrea McClain
Defendant: Scott Ebert, Robert Chabot, Ferguson-Florissant School District, Jessica Ponder and Leslie Hogshead
Case Number: 4:2019cv00168
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Bond Order by Plaintiff The City of Berkeley, Missouri. (Banks, Eric)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff The City of Berkeley, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order for TRO)(Banks, Eric)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Requesting Hearing on TRO: by Plaintiff The City of Berkeley, Missouri (Banks, Eric)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward J. Sluys for Defendants Robert Chabot, Scott Ebert, Ferguson-Florissant School District, Leslie Hogshead, Jessica Ponder. (Sluys, Edward)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Robert Chabot, Scott Ebert, Ferguson-Florissant School District, Leslie Hogshead, Jessica Ponder. (Ormsby, Cindy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Robert Chabot, Scott Ebert, Ferguson-Florissant School District, Leslie Hogshead, Jessica Ponder. (Ormsby, Cindy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Cindy Reeds Ormsby for Defendants Robert Chabot, Scott Ebert, Ferguson-Florissant School District, Leslie Hogshead, Jessica Ponder. (Ormsby, Cindy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The City of Berkeley, Missouri. Scott Ebert served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Banks, Eric)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The City of Berkeley, Missouri. Leslie Hogshead served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Banks, Eric)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The City of Berkeley, Missouri. Jessica Ponder served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Banks, Eric)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The City of Berkeley, Missouri. Ferguson-Florissant School District served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Banks, Eric)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The City of Berkeley, Missouri. Robert Chabot served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Banks, Eric)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Eric Banks. (BRP)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff The City of Berkeley, Missouri Process Server: William Stage (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in flattened PDF format)(Banks, Eric)
February 5, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD)
February 5, 2019 ***REMARK: As of 2:00 p.m. on 2/5/2019, attorney for plaintiff Eric Kendall Banks has not filed the required service documents pursuant to Local Rule 2.02 or a redacted complaint that is compliant with Local Rule 2.17. Attorney Banks has also failed to file a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as referenced in the complaint. Clerk's Office to proceed with judge assignment. (JWD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-7014878, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by The City of Berkeley, Missouri.(Banks, Eric) Modified on 2/4/2019 (JWD). Clerk's note: Main document sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains the full names of minor children. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form) (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Berkeley, Missouri et al v. Ferguson-Florissant School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Berkeley, Missouri
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnetta Robinson
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Willis
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charvan Jamerson
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Anthony
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea McClain
Represented By: Eric Kendall Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ebert
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Represented By: Edward J. Sluys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chabot
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Represented By: Edward J. Sluys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson-Florissant School District
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Represented By: Edward J. Sluys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Ponder
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Represented By: Edward J. Sluys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Hogshead
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Represented By: Edward J. Sluys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?