Lawrence v. TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Lawrence
Defendant: TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc. and James Brand
Case Number: 4:2019cv00169
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Gregory Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Riley Affidavit)(Kennedy, Melvin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri filed by Defendants James Brand, TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc.. (McCarthy, Thomas)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This matter, having come before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Remand, the Court hereby ORDERS that: All currently pending deadlines for the parties related to the pleadings that have been filed [Docs. #8, 9, 10 and 11] are hereby STAYED pending the Court's determination on whether this matter should be remanded to the Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/12/2019. (JMC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Stay re #11 Answer to Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint, #9 MOTION to Dismiss :Failure to State a Claim, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Gregory Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dashtaki, Cyrus)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Gregory Lawrence. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri by Plaintiff Gregory Lawrence. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by James Brand.(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss :Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant James Brand. (McCarthy, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss :Failure to State a Claim by Defendant James Brand. (McCarthy, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc..(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants James Brand, TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc. (State Court Acknowledgment of Receipt) Sent To: State Court - Executed (McCarthy, Thomas)
February 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JWD)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Petition. (JWD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Charles County Circuit Court, filed by Gregory Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter, #2 MCHR Letter)(JWD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D. Younger for Defendants James Brand, TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc.. (Younger, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. (McCarthy, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas O. McCarthy for Defendants James Brand, TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc.. (McCarthy, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit, case number 1811-CC01195, with receipt number 0865-7015151, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by James Brand, TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Memorandum to the Court and Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Jill Chaney-Lipe, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(McCarthy, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVS Supply Chain Solutions North America, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas O. McCarthy
Represented By: Robert D. Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brand
Represented By: Thomas O. McCarthy
Represented By: Robert D. Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lawrence
Represented By: Melvin David Kennedy
Represented By: Cyrus C. Dashtaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?