Jackson et al v. Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Clinton Jackson and James Thomas
Defendant: Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00178
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 3, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 3, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
April 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 27, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 27, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jay Aldis on behalf of Defendant [ECF No. 27] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/27/19. (ALM)
March 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (3))(Srey, Rachhana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL re #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Aldis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7111703) by Defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Aldis, Jay)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Jay Aldis shall be held in ABEYANCE pending compliance with E.D. Mo. L.R. 12.01(F) requiring a movant attorney to "include as an attachment to the motion for admission pro hac vice a current certificate of good standing from the highest court of state in which the attorney resides or is regularly employed as an attorney," which is the State of Texas. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/26/19. (ALM)
March 25, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Aldis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7111703) by Defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Aldis, Jay)
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Ida S. Shafaie for Defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Shafaie, Ida)
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Rule 16 Conference and Deadlines [ECF No. 21] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference is rescheduled to Friday, April 19, 2019 at 11:00 AM in my Chambers. The parties shall file their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan no later than April 12, 2019. All remaining provisions in the Order Setting Rule 16 Conference dated March 13, 2019 [ECF No. 19]shall be in full force and effect. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/18/19. (ALM)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension Unopposed of: Rule 16 Conference and Deadlines Related to the Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srey, Rachhana)
March 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/5/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/12/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/13/2019. (AFC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Brenner, Jeremy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC.(Brenner, Jeremy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy Michael Brenner for Defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Brenner, Jeremy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A. Kaiser for Defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC. (Kaiser, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Amended Complaint Affidavit of Service by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas. (Srey, Rachhana)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by James Thomas, Clinton Jackson. Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Srey, Rachhana) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #1 Issued Summons) (BRP).
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (1))(Srey, Rachhana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC , filed by James Thomas, Clinton Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Srey, Rachhana)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A. Potashnick for Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas. (Potashnick, Mark)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jay Eidsness and Rachhana T. Srey on behalf of the Plaintiffs [ECF Nos. 2, 3] are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/6/19. (ALM)
February 5, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Racchana Srey. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas Process Server: Christina Tiffany (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Srey, Rachhana)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachhana Srey. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7018926) by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas. (Srey, Rachhana)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Eidsness. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7018921) by Plaintiffs Clinton Jackson, James Thomas. (Srey, Rachhana) Modified on 2/5/2019 (JWD). Clerk's note: Document filed on behalf of attorney Jay Eidsness using the login of attorney Srey Racchana. This is a violation of the Court's Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing, Section II. Attorney advised that the future, all filings in this matter must be made using the login and password of the attorney who signed the document being filed.
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC with receipt number 0865-7018890, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by James Thomas, Clinton Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Verified Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #6 Verified Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Srey, Rachhana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergies3 TEC Services, LLC
Represented By: Ida S. Shafaie
Represented By: Jay R. Aldis
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Brenner
Represented By: Robert A. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Jackson
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Represented By: Jay E. Eidsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?