Mahdi v. Bush et al
Plaintiff: lakenia mahdi
Defendant: Julian L. Bush, Mayor Lyda Krewson, Chief John Hayden, The City of St. Louis Mayor and St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Chief of Police
Case Number: 4:2019cv00183
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiff Lakenia Mahdi with case number 18-cv-00518 and 19-cv-01364 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A- Memorandum In Support, #3 Exhibit B- City Rec Policy, #4 Exhibit C- Higgins Deposition, #5 Exhibit D-Manual Filing, #6 Exhibit E- Corr. between City, #7 Exhibit 1-Mahdi Complaint, #8 Exhibit 2-Ball-Bey Complaint, #9 Exhibit 3- White Complaint, #10 Exhibit 4 Dailey Declaration)(Dailey, Daniel)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel A. Dailey. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7021994) by Plaintiff Lakenia Mahdi (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Dailey, Daniel) filed by Lakenia Mahdi ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/26/19. (CLA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFG)
February 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
February 7, 2019 ***REMARK: Attorneys for plaintiff contacted on 2/6/19 and 2/7/19 and directed to file Original Filing Form and service documents pursuant to Local Rule 2.02. Documents not filed as of 12:00 p.m. 2/7/19. Clerk's Office to proceed with judge assignment. Summons or waivers to issue upon filing. (JWD)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against defendant Lakenia Mahdi with receipt number 0865-7021996, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by lakenia mahdi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wooten, Jermaine)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel A. Dailey. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7021994) by Plaintiff Lakenia Mahdi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Dailey, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahdi v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: lakenia mahdi
Represented By: Daniel A. Dailey
Represented By: Jermaine Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian L. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Lyda Krewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief John Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of St. Louis Mayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?