Donoho et al v. City of Pacific, Missouri
Plaintiff: Deboarh Donoho, Cassidy Hodge and Deborah Donoho
Defendant: City of Pacific, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2019cv00186
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Conditionally Certify FLSA Collective Action, to Order Disclosure of Contact Information for Similarly Situated Individuals, and to Approve Notice for Dissemination to those Similarly Situated is GRANTED [Doc. #4 ].IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall, no later than April 18, 2019, provide Plaintiffs counsel with a list of the Pacific Police Department dispatchers full names, addresses, phone numbers, e-mail addresses, and dates of service in a readable electronic data file format.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed notice and consent form [Docs. 5-3, 5-4.] submitted by Plaintiffs is APPROVED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may send out the proposed notice and consent form. Response to Court due by 4/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 04/04/2019. (AAS)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Motion to Join Parties due by 5/31/2019. Discovery Completion due by 12/31/2019. ADR Future Reference 8/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Status Conference set for 6/27/2019 10:00 AM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/29/19. (CLA)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to conditional certification by Defendant City of Pacific, Missouri.. (Jones, Robert) Modified on 3/29/2019 (CLA).
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker: Rule 16 Conference held on 3/28/2019. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 11:00AM) (proceedings ended: 11:15AM) (JAB)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Deborah Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. . (Mueth, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 is set for March 28, 2019, at 11:00 AM at the chambers of the undersigned in the Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse Thirteenth Floor North. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/21/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/6/19. (JAB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Pacific, Missouri.(Jones, Robert)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant City of Pacific, Missouri, Plaintiffs Deborah Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. (Attachments: #1 consent) (CLA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Carl J. Lumley for Defendant City of Pacific, Missouri. (Lumley, Carl)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert E. Jones for Defendant City of Pacific, Missouri. (Jones, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Deborah Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. City of Pacific, Missouri served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Mueth, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Deborah Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Deborah Donoho, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Cassidy Hodge, #3 Exhibit Notice Form, #4 Exhibit Consent to Join Form)(Dolley, Kevin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Deborah Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. (Dolley, Kevin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael G. Mueth for Plaintiffs Deborah Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. (Mueth, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Kevin J. Dolley. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Deboarh Donoho, Cassidy Hodge Process Server: Robert Pedroli (BAK)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-7024535, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Deboarh Donoho, Cassidy Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Donoho Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hodge Consent to Join, #3 Civil Cover Sheet , #4 Original Filing Form , #5 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Special Process Server, #6 Summons)(Dolley, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donoho et al v. City of Pacific, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deboarh Donoho
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassidy Hodge
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Michael G. Mueth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Donoho
Represented By: Michael G. Mueth
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pacific, Missouri
Represented By: Robert E. Jones
Represented By: Carl J. Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?