Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London a/s/o Trinity Property Consultants d/b/a Magnolia Apartments and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00214
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J. de Luca for Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (de Luca, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC.(Bax, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James A Bax for Defendant BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC. (Bax, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen M. Strum for Defendant BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC. (Strum, Stephen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Radice, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert J. Radice. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London a/s/o Trinity Property Consultants d/b/a Magnolia Apartments Process Server: Sheriff of St Louis County (Radice, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC with receipt number 0865-7034324, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London a/s/o Trinity Property Consultants d/b/a Magnolia Apartments. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Radice, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BluSky Restoration Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Stephen M. Strum
Represented By: James A Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London a/s/o Trinity Property Consultants d/b/a Magnolia Apartments
Represented By: Robert J. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Daniel J. de Luca
Represented By: Robert J. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?