Gardner v. Modern Metals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ryan Gardner
Defendant: Modern Metals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00220
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REMAND IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this matter isREMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. cc: City(CLA)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III withoutPrejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) (ECF No. 16) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. 10) isGRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, Missouri. An appropriate Order of Remand will accompany this Order. #16 #10 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. (CLA)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and III Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Murray v. Marchbanks)(Rowe, Susan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and III Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Dungey Case)(Rowe, Susan)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - #10 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 10) is HELD IN ABEYANCE.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted until Monday, May 6, 2019, within which to conduct discovery and produce to the Court a copy of the individual employment contract between Plaintiff and Defendant. Response to Court due by 5/6/2019.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/20/19. (KKS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Campbell v. Anytime Labor-Kansas LLC)(Rowe, Susan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wendler, Brian)
February 16, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Rowe, Susan)
February 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exibit A Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff with Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Rowe, Susan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Modern Metals, Inc..(Rowe, Susan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Certificate of Service Sent To: Plaintiff (Rowe, Susan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal to State Court as Filed in the State Court, #2 State Court Docket Entries)(Rowe, Susan)
February 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ryan Gardner.(MFG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff)(Rowe, Susan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri, case number 1922-CC00038, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff and Exhibits thereto, #2 Documents Filed in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case filing Form, #5 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure form)(Rowe, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Modern Metals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gardner
Represented By: Angie Marie Zinzilieta
Represented By: Brian M. Wendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Nell Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?