Jones v. Keen et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Gerard Jones
Defendant: Daniel Keen, Unknown Coleman, Unknown Simon, Dawn Unknown and Unknown McGee
Case Number: 4:2019cv00270
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nathaniel Jones. Returned document(s): #5 Clerk's Reassignment Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (AAS)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Thu Apr 11 15:19:41 CDT 2019 (Shirley, Kelley)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit the application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs within twentyone (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Form) (Attached form sent with Order)(KJS)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Fri Apr 5 12:26:23 CDT 2019 (Bernsen, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings. (JAB)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nathaniel Gerard Jones. Returned document(s): #3 Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (CLO)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Nathaniel Gerard Jones re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (JAB)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 22, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Feb 22 16:00:52 CST 2019 (admin,)
February 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (DLB)
February 22, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Nathaniel Gerard Jones Jury Demand,, filed by Nathaniel Gerard Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Keen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Gerard Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?