Frame et al v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: James Frame, JAYNI D FRAME and Jayni D. Frame
Defendant: PREMIER ESTATE AND INCOME PLANNING, LLC, SCOTT GARCIA and Scott L. Garcia
Case Number: 4:2019cv00274
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by James Frame, Jayni D. Frame. Scott L. Garcia served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Premier Estate and Income Planning, LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement proof of service on the business)(Cosgrove, David)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Fri Mar 29 09:16:03 CDT 2019 (Porter, Brittany)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Scott L. Garcia and Premier Estate and Planning, LLC's Consent Motion for Continuance and Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED up to and including April 24, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/28/19. (THL)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension by Defendant Scott L. Garcia. (BRP)
February 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to David B. Cosgrove. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs JAYNI D FRAME, James Frame Process Server: ProServe (Cosgrove, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Scott Garcia and Premier Estate and Income Planning, LLC, with receipt number 0865-7051088, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand, filed by James Frame, JAYNI D FRAME. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through R, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Garcia Summons, #5 Summons Premier Summons)(Cosgrove, David) Modified on 2/21/2019 (CMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frame et al v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER ESTATE AND INCOME PLANNING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Frame
Represented By: David B. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYNI D FRAME
Represented By: David B. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayni D. Frame
Represented By: David B. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?