Taylor v. Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC
Plaintiff: Stacy Taylor
Defendant: Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus and Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00282
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ORDER BY CONSENT GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPELARBITRATION AND STAYING ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATIONThe parties having filed a joint motion consenting to the arbitration of this matter and staying ~he action pending arbjtration, the Court hereby enters its Order: (1) granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration ("Motion to Compel, Arbitration," Doc. 4), (2) appointing United States Arbitration & Mediation to administer the arbitration, and (3) staying the above-captioned case pending the completion of arbitration.The patties shall file a joint status report within ten days of a written decision regarding the outcome of the arbitration proceedings. #10 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. (CLA)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Proposed Order: by Plaintiff Stacy Taylor re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Brody, Bryan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Stacy Taylor.. (Brody, Bryan)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Stacy Taylor. (Brody, Bryan) filed by Stacy Taylor ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/7/19. (CLA)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Stacy Taylor. (Brody, Bryan)
February 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Stacy Taylor.(MFG)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kraushaar, Corey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus. (Kraushaar, Corey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Kraushaar, Corey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Kraushaar, Corey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC00128, with receipt number 0865-7051637, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment State Court File and Docket Sheet)(Kraushaar, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Taylor
Represented By: Bryan E. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lexus
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury St. Louis Lex, LLC
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?