MacMann v. Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Traci L. MacMann
Defendant: Tropicana St. Louis, LLC and Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00404
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/13/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/20/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/15/19. (KEK)
April 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tropicana St. Louis, LLC.(Colvin, Amanda)
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tropicana Entertainment, Inc..(Colvin, Amanda)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn Palmer Scott for Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Scott, Kathryn)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles B. Jellinek for Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Jellinek, Charles)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Colvin, Amanda) filed by Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. Tropicana St. Louis, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. [ANSWER NOW DUE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 10, 2019] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/28/19. (KEK)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Colvin, Amanda)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Rahmberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7078953) by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rahmberg, Michael) filed by Traci L. MacMann; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/8/19. (KEK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Rahmberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7078953) by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rahmberg, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan L. McClelland for Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (McClelland, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Thomas Ricke for Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Ricke, Alexander)
March 5, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to George A. Hanson. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations (Hanson, George)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC with receipt number 0865-7072238, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Traci L. MacMann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., #5 Summons Tropicana St. Louis, LLC)(Hanson, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacMann v. Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana St. Louis, LLC
Represented By: Amanda E. Colvin
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Represented By: Kathryn Palmer Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda E. Colvin
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Represented By: Kathryn Palmer Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci L. MacMann
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: Alexander Thomas Ricke
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?