StockFood America, Inc. v. Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: StockFood America, Inc.
Defendant: Gregory Mosberger and Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00415
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc.. Parent companies: Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (O'Brien, James)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/7/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/14/2019 09:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/23/2019. (CBL)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc., Gregory Mosberger.(O'Brien, James)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc. and Gregory Mosberger; ORDERED GRANTED. Answer Due 4/22/19. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/16/19. (EAB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension #1 Complaint, of: Time to File Answer, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc., Gregory Mosberger. (O'Brien, James)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/5/19. (CDP)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc., Gregory Mosberger. (O'Brien, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by James V. O'Brien for Defendants Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc., Gregory Mosberger. (O'Brien, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by StockFood America, Inc.. Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc. served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by StockFood America, Inc.. Gregory Mosberger served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan E. Ross for Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc.. (Ross, Nathan)
March 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attoreny Richard Voytas. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (JWD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (JWD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc. Process Server: Associated Research Services, LLC; Mark Effinger (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc. Process Server: Associated Research Services, LLC; Mark Effinger (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc.. Parent companies: StockFood GmbH, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Voytas, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc., Gregory Mosberger with receipt number 0865-7077708, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by StockFood America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StockFood America, Inc. v. Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StockFood America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan E. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Mosberger
Represented By: James V. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory's Creative Cuisine, Inc.
Represented By: James V. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?